Docket for 13D2738
No. 13D2738 | |
Title: | BERG, PHILIP |
Atty Name: | Philip J. Berg |
City/State: | Lafayette Hill, Pennsylvania |
Sex: | M |
Barno: | 217277 |
Mailing Info: | |
Filing Party: | Samuel C. Stretton |
| 301 S. High Street
P.O. Box 3231 |
| West Chester, PA 19381 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, Eastern District |
Action: | Suspended |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jul 2 2013 |
Suspense Filed |
Nov 4 2013 |
Suspense Order |
Nov 15 2013 |
Return Filed |
Dec 31 2013 |
Response Filed |
Dec 31 2013 |
Resignation Filed |
Jan 21 2014 |
Final Order - Resigned |
|