Docket for 13-9067
No. 13-9067 | |
Title: |
Alberto Concepcion, Petitioner |
v. |
United States Customs and Border Protection Agency |
|
Docketed: | March 10, 2014 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-5043) |
Decision Date: | December 27, 2013 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Feb 19 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 9, 2014) |
Apr 9 2014 |
Waiver of right of respondent United States Customs and Border Protection Agency to respond filed. |
Apr 17 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 2, 2014. |
May 5 2014 |
The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied, and the petition for a writ of certiorari is dismissed. See Rule 39.8. As the petitioner has repeatedly abused this Court's process, the Clerk is directed not to accept any further petitions in noncriminal matters from petitioner unless the docketing fee required by Rule 38(a) is paid and the petition is submitted in compliance with Rule 33.1. See Martin v. District of Columbia Court of Appeals, 506 U. S. 1 (1992) (per curiam). |
|