Docket for 13-865
No. 13-865 | |
Title: |
Novozymes A/S, et al., Petitioners |
v. |
Dupont Nutrition Biosciences APS, et al. |
|
Docketed: | January 22, 2014 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (2012-1433) |
Decision Date: | July 22, 2013 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 23, 2013 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jan 20 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 21, 2014) |
Feb 7 2014 |
Waiver of right of respondent Dupont Nutrition Biosciences APS, et al. to respond filed. |
Feb 12 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 28, 2014. |
Mar 3 2014 |
Petition DENIED. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |
|