Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 13-5193
No. 13-5193
Title:
David Gerard Jeep, Petitioner
v.
Barack H. Obama, President of the United States, et al.
Docketed:July 9, 2013
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(12-2435)
  Decision Date:August 2, 2012
  Rehearing Denied:September 12, 2012
Discretionary Court  
  Decision Date:April 27, 2012
  Rehearing Denied:May 7, 2012

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Sep 18 2012 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 8, 2013)
Jul 18 2013 Waiver of right of respondent Barack H. Obama, President of the United States, et al. to respond filed.
Jul 25 2013 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 30, 2013.
Oct 7 2013 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
David G. Jeep General Delivery(314) 514-5228
Saint Louis, MO  63155-9999
Dave@DGJeep.com
Party name: David Gerard Jeep
Attorneys for Respondents:
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: Barack H. Obama, President of the United States, et al.
June 25, 2017 | Version 2014.2