Docket for 13-10492
No. 13-10492 | |
Title: |
Edgar Concepcion, Jr., Petitioner |
v. |
Iowa |
|
Docketed: | June 10, 2014 |
Lower Ct: | Court of Appeals of Iowa |
Case Nos.: | (3-1080 / 10-1931) |
Decision Date: | January 9, 2014 |
Discretionary Court | |
Decision Date: | March 4, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jun 2 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 10, 2014) |
Jul 10 2014 |
Waiver of right of respondent Iowa to respond filed. |
Jul 24 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 29, 2014. |
Oct 6 2014 |
Petition DENIED. |
|