Docket for 12-7827
No. 12-7827 | |
Title: |
In Re Eduardo Licon, Petitioner |
v. |
|
|
Docketed: | December 19, 2012 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 13 2012 |
Petition for writ of habeas corpus and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. |
Dec 20 2012 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 11, 2013. |
Jan 14 2013 |
Petition DENIED. |
Feb 4 2013 |
Petition for Rehearing filed. |
Feb 27 2013 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 15, 2013. |
Mar 18 2013 |
Rehearing DENIED. |
|