Docket for 11-685
No. 11-685 | |
Title: |
Highway J Citizens Group, U.A., Petitioner |
v. |
Village of Richfield, Wisconsin |
|
Docketed: | December 5, 2011 |
Lower Ct: | Court of Appeals of Wisconsin, District II |
Case Nos.: | (2010AP1162) |
Decision Date: | February 16, 2011 |
Rehearing Denied: | March 24, 2011 |
Discretionary Court | |
Decision Date: | September 1, 2011 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 30 2011 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 4, 2012) |
Jan 4 2012 |
Brief of respondent Village of Richfield, Wisconsin in opposition filed. |
Jan 4 2012 |
Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by National Tax Limitation Committee, et al. |
Jan 17 2012 |
Reply of petitioner Highway J Citizens Group, U.A. filed. (Distributed) |
Jan 18 2012 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 17, 2012. |
Feb 21 2012 |
Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by National Tax Limitation Committee, et al. GRANTED. |
Feb 21 2012 |
Petition DENIED. |
|