Docket for 11-6467
No. 11-6467 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Curtis Guy, Petitioner |
v. |
Nevada |
|
Docketed: | September 19, 2011 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Nevada |
Case Nos.: | (50350) |
Decision Date: | February 24, 2011 |
Rehearing Denied: | May 17, 2011 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Aug 15 2011 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 19, 2011) |
Oct 19 2011 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 18, 2011. |
Nov 18 2011 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including December 19, 2011. |
Dec 1 2011 |
Brief of respondent Nevada in opposition filed. |
Dec 15 2011 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 6, 2012. |
Jan 4 2012 |
Reply of petitioner Curtis Guy filed. (Distributed) |
Jan 9 2012 |
Petition DENIED. |
|