Docket for 10-301
No. 10-301 | |
Title: |
Anascape, Ltd., Petitioner |
v. |
Nintendo of America, Inc. |
|
Docketed: | August 31, 2010 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (2008-1500) |
Decision Date: | April 13, 2010 |
Rehearing Denied: | June 1, 2010 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Aug 27 2010 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 30, 2010) |
Sep 24 2010 |
Brief of respondent Nintendo of America, Inc. in opposition filed. |
Oct 4 2010 |
Reply of petitioner Anascape, Ltd. filed. |
Oct 6 2010 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 29, 2010. |
Nov 1 2010 |
Petition DENIED. |
|