Docket for 10-257
No. 10-257 | |
Title: |
North County Communications Corp., Petitioner |
v. |
California Catalog & Technology, dba CTT Telecomms (OCN 573B), et al. |
|
Docketed: | August 24, 2010 |
Linked with 09A1157 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (08-55048) |
Decision Date: | February 10, 2010 |
Rehearing Denied: | March 24, 2010 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
May 26 2010 |
Application (09A1157) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 22, 2010 to August 20, 2010, submitted to Justice Kennedy. |
Jun 3 2010 |
Application (09A1157) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until August 20, 2010. |
Aug 20 2010 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 23, 2010) |
Sep 15 2010 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 25, 2010, for all respondents. |
Oct 25 2010 |
Brief of respondents T-Mobile USA, Cingular Wireless, and Cricket Communications in opposition filed. |
Nov 5 2010 |
Reply of petitioner North County Communications Corp. filed. |
Nov 8 2010 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 23, 2010. |
Nov 29 2010 |
Petition DENIED. |
|