Docket for 09-7660
No. 09-7660 | |
Title: |
Stephen Ulrich, Petitioner |
v. |
David W. Butler, Individually and in His Official Capacity as Associate Circuit Judge of the Eleventh Circuit of Illinois, Woodford County |
|
Docketed: | November 20, 2009 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (09-2414, 09-2610) |
Decision Date: | August 31, 2009 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 2, 2009 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 17 2009 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 21, 2009) |
Jan 7 2010 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 22, 2010. |
Jan 25 2010 |
Petition DENIED. |
|