Docket for 07-7965
No. 07-7965 | |
Title: |
Jonathan Elliott, Petitioner |
v. |
Church of Scientology International, et al. |
|
Docketed: | December 3, 2007 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (07-11027-F) |
Decision Date: | September 14, 2007 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 26 2007 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 2, 2008) |
Jan 17 2008 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 15, 2008. |
Feb 19 2008 |
Petition DENIED. |
May 3 2008 |
Motion for leave to file a petition for rehearing filed by petitioner. |
May 27 2008 |
Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 12, 2008. |
Jun 16 2008 |
Motion for leave to file a petition for rehearing filed by petitioner DENIED. |
|