Docket for 05-7471
No. 05-7471 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Lester Leroy Bower, Petitioner |
v. |
Doug Dretke, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division |
|
Docketed: | November 10, 2005 |
Linked with 05A379 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (03-40980) |
Decision Date: | August 11, 2005 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 27 2005 |
Application (05A379) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 9, 2005 to December 9, 2005, submitted to Justice Scalia. |
Nov 8 2005 |
Application (05A379) denied by Justice Scalia. |
Nov 9 2005 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 12, 2005) |
Dec 12 2005 |
Brief of respondent Doug Dretke, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division in opposition filed. |
Dec 28 2005 |
Reply of petitioner Lester Leroy Bower filed. (Distributed) |
Dec 29 2005 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 13, 2006. |
Jan 17 2006 |
Petition DENIED. |
|