Docket for 03-145
No. 03-145 | |
Title: |
Don Hamrick, Petitioner |
v. |
George W. Bush, President of the United States, et al. |
|
Docketed: | July 28, 2003 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (02-5334) |
| Rule 11 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 27 2002 |
Petition for writ of certiorari before judgment filed. (Response due August 27, 2003) |
Aug 19 2003 |
Waiver of right of respondent George W. Bush, President of the United States, et al. to respond filed. |
Aug 20 2003 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 29, 2003. |
Oct 6 2003 |
Petition DENIED. |
|