Docket for 01-1692
No. 01-1692 |
Status: | DECIDED |
| Title: |
Midwest Gas Users' Association, Petitioner |
| | v. |
| |
Federal Energy Regulatory Commission, et al. |
Docketed: | Lower Ct: |
United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit |
May 20, 2002 | |
(01-1342) |
~~Date~~~~~~ |
~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
May 15 2002 | Petition for writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 22, 2002) |
Jun 10 2002 | Waiver of right of respondent Pioneer Natural Resources USA, Inc. to |
| respond filed. |
Jun 14 2002 | Order extending time to file response to petition until July 22, |
| 2002. |
Jun 14 2002 | This extension of time is granted for all respondents. |
Jul 22 2002 | Brief of respondent Williams Gas Pipelines Central, Inc. in opposition |
| filed. |
Jul 22 2002 | Brief of respondent Federal Energy Regulatory Commission in opposition |
| filed. |
Aug 7 2002 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 30, 2002 |
Oct 7 2002 | Petition DENIED. |
| ******************************************************** |
| |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | | |
Stuart W. Conrad | 1209 PennTower Office Center | 8167531122 |
| 3100 Broadway | |
| Kansas City, MO 64111 | |
| | |
Attorneys for Respondent: | | |
Solicitor General | U.S. Department of Justice | |
| Washington, DC 20530 | |
| | |
Dana C. Contrato | Crowell & Moring | |
| 1001 Pennsylvania Av., N.W. | |
| Washington, DC 20004-2595 | |
Party name: Kansas Gas Service Co. |
| | |
Michael L. Pate | 110 West 7th Street | |
| Box 300 | |
| Tulsa, OK 74101 | |
Party name: Oxy USA, Inc. |
| | |
Nancy J. Skancke | 1500 K Street, N. W. | 2024085400 |
| Suite 330 | |
| Washington, DC 20005 | |
Party name: Pioneer Natural Resources USA |
| | |
John J. McNish | 1500 S. W. Arrowhead Road | |
| Topeka, KS 66604-4027 | |
| | |
William F. Demarest Jr. | 600 14th Street, N. W. | |
| Suite 800 | |
| Washington, DC 20005 | |
Party name: Kansas and Kansas Corp. Commn. |
| | |
David D'Alessandro | 1150 Eighteenth Street, N. W. | |
| Suite 800 | |
| Washington, DC 20036-3816 | |
| | |
Gary W. Boyle | Williams Companies, Inc. | 9185732359 |
| P.O. Box 2400 | |
| Tulsa, OK 74102 | |
Party name: Williams Gas Pipelines Central, Inc. |
| | |
Mark R. Haskell | 805 15th Street, N. W. | |
| Suite 1101 | |
| Washington, DC 20005 | |
Party name: Amoco Production Co., Mobil Oil Corp, OXY USA, RME Petroleum |
| | |
| | |
|