SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Visitor Guidelines
Accessibility
Maps & Guides
Courtroom Lectures
Exhibitions
Group Visits
Activities for Students & Families
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 24-267
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 24-267
Title:
John Abdelsayed, et al., Petitioners
v.
Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.
Docketed:
September 10, 2024
Linked with 24A91
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
Case Numbers:
(23-11662)
Decision Date:
February 28, 2024
Rehearing Denied:
May 8, 2024
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jul 23 2024
Application (24A91) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 6, 2024 to October 5, 2024, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Jul 25 2024
Application (24A91) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until September 5, 2024.
Sep 04 2024
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 10, 2024)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Oct 23 2024
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/8/2024.
Nov 01 2024
Response Requested. (Due December 2, 2024)
Dec 02 2024
Brief of respondent Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc. in opposition filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Dec 16 2024
Reply of petitioners John Abdelsayed, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Dec 18 2024
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2025.
Jan 13 2025
Petition DENIED.
Feb 07 2025
Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Feb 19 2025
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/7/2025.
Mar 10 2025
Rehearing DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Griffin Clayton Klema
Counsel of Record
Klema Law, PL
420 W. Kennedy Boulevard
Second Floor
Tampa, FL 33606
Griffin@KlemaLaw.com
202-713-5292
Party name: John Abdelsayed, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Daniel DeSouza
Counsel of Record
Copycat Legal PLLC
3111 N. University Drive
301
Coral Springs, FL 33065
dan@copycatlegal.com
8774376228
Party name: Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.
Daniel DeSouza
CopyCat Legal PLLC
3111 N. University Drive, Suite 301
Coral Springs, FL 33065
dan@copycatlegal.com
877-437-6228
Party name: Affordable Aerial Photography, Inc.
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##