SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 23A472 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 23A472 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Travis Dwight Green, Applicant
v.
Bobby Lumpkin, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division
Docketed:
November 27, 2023
Linked with 23-6451
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(20-70021)
Decision Date:
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Nov 21 2023
Application (23A472) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 4, 2023 to February 1, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Proof of Service
Nov 28 2023
Application (23A472) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until January 8, 2024.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Tivon Schardl
Counsel of Record
Federal Defender, TXWD, Capital Habeas Unit
919 Congress, Suite 950
Austin, TX 78701
Tivon_Schardl@fd.org
7372073008
Party name: Travis Green
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##