Docket for 23A194 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Aug 22 2023 | Application (23A194) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 12, 2023 to November 11, 2023, submitted to Justice Alito. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of ServiceOther | Aug 30 2023 | Application (23A194) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until October 12, 2023. | | |
|