Docket for 23-855
|
Jan 15 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 11, 2024) | | PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Feb 09 2024 | Proof of Service of Petition for Writ of Certiorari of Richard Abbott not accepted for filing. (February 09, 2024) | | | Mar 06 2024 | Waiver of right of respondent Delaware Supreme Court, et al. to respond filed. | | Main Document | Mar 12 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/28/2024. | | | Mar 18 2024 | Response Requested. (Due April 17, 2024) | | | Mar 28 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 17, 2024 to May 1, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Mar 29 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 1, 2024. | | |
|