Docket for 23-822
|
Jan 26 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 29, 2024) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Feb 21 2024 | Waiver of right of respondents ABC News, Inc.; ABC News Interactive, Inc., The Walt Disney Company to respond filed. | | Main Document | Feb 21 2024 | Waiver of right of respondent New York Times Company to respond filed. | | Main Document | Feb 21 2024 | Waiver of right of respondents Gannett Co., Inc. and Gannett Sattelite Information Network, LLC to respond filed. | | Main Document | Feb 21 2024 | Waiver of right of respondents CBS News Inc., ViacomCBS Inc. (n/k/a Paramount Global), and CBS Interactive Inc. to respond filed. | | Main Document | Feb 21 2024 | Waiver of right of respondent Rolling Stone, LLC and Penske Media Corporation to respond filed. | | Main Document | Mar 06 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/22/2024. | | | Mar 25 2024 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|