SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 23-7165
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 23-7165
Title:
Emiliano Emmanuel Flores-González, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:
April 8, 2024
Linked with 23A767
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
Case Numbers:
(19-2204)
Decision Date:
November 8, 2023
Rehearing Denied:
December 6, 2023
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Feb 16 2024
Application (23A767) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 5, 2024 to April 4, 2024, submitted to Justice Jackson.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Feb 22 2024
Application (23A767) granted by Justice Jackson extending the time to file until April 4, 2024.
Apr 04 2024
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 8, 2024)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Apr 12 2024
Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 18 2024
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2024.
Apr 24 2024
Response Requested. (Due May 24, 2024)
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kevin Edward Lerman
Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender, District of Puerto Rico
241 F.D. Roosevelt Ave
San Juan, PR 00918
KEVIN_LERMAN@FD.ORG
7872814922
Party name: Emiliano Emmanuel Flores-González
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##