Docket for 23-713
|
Oct 12 2023 | Application (23A339) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 7, 2023 to January 2, 2024, submitted to the The Chief Justice. | | | Oct 12 2023 | Application (23A340) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 1, 2023 to December 31, 2023, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Oct 16 2023 | Application (23A339) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until January 2, 2024. | | | Oct 16 2023 | Application (23A340) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 31, 2023. | | | Dec 29 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 2, 2024) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 23 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 2, 2024 to March 4, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jan 24 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 4, 2024. | | | Feb 01 2024 | Brief amicus curiae of National Law School Veterans Clinic Consortium filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Feb 02 2024 | Brief amicus curiae of Military-Veterans Advocacy filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Feb 02 2024 | Brief amicus curiae of Federal Circuit Bar Association filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Feb 02 2024 | Brief amicus curiae of National Veterans Legal Services Program filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Feb 27 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 4, 2024 to March 18, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Feb 29 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 18, 2024. | | | Mar 18 2024 | Brief of respondent Denis McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Apr 01 2024 | Reply of petitioners Joshua E. Bufkin, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Apr 03 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/19/2024. | | | Apr 22 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/26/2024. | | | Apr 29 2024 | Petition GRANTED. | | |
|