SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 23-700
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 23-700
Title:
Palani Karupaiyan, Petitioner
v.
New York, et al.
Docketed:
December 29, 2023
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
Case Numbers:
(23-1257)
Decision Date:
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Nov 12 2023
Petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment filed. (Response due January 29, 2024)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jan 03 2024
Motion to dismiss the petition for a writ of certiorar pursuant to Rule 46 filed by petitioner.
Main Document
Feb 12 2024
Petition Dismissed - Rule 46.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Palani Karupaiyan
1326 W. William St., Room #2
Philadelphia, PA 19132
(212) 470-2048
Party name: Palani Karupaiyan
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##