Docket for 23-6966
|
Feb 14 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 11, 2024) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 18 2024 | Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed. | | Main Document | Mar 21 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2024. | | | Mar 22 2024 | Response Requested. (Due April 22, 2024) | | | Apr 18 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 22, 2024 to May 22, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Apr 19 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 22, 2024. | | |
|