Docket for 23-6960
|
Jan 16 2024 | Application (23A674) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 30, 2024 to March 29, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito. | | Main Document | Jan 22 2024 | Application (23A674) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 29, 2024. | | | Mar 07 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 10, 2024) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Mar 22 2024 | Waiver of right of respondent Mississippi to respond filed. | | Main Document | Mar 28 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2024. | | | Mar 28 2024 | Response Requested. (Due April 29, 2024) | | | Apr 02 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 29, 2024 to May 29, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Apr 03 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 29, 2024. | | | Apr 24 2024 | Brief amici curiae of Southern Center for Human Rights, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
|