Docket for 23-686
|
Dec 22 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 26, 2024) | | | Dec 22 2023 | Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system. | | | Jan 25 2024 | Waiver of right of respondent Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General to respond filed. | | Main Document | Jan 31 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2024. | | | Feb 06 2024 | Response Requested. (Due March 7, 2024) | | | Feb 29 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 7, 2024 to April 8, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Mar 01 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 8, 2024. | | | Mar 26 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 8, 2024 to May 8, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | | Mar 28 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 8, 2024. | | |
|