SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 23-6757
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 23-6757
Title:
Bryan Alan Kennert, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:
February 15, 2024
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(22-1998)
Decision Date:
August 3, 2023
Rehearing Denied:
November 14, 2023
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Feb 12 2024
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 18, 2024)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Proof of Service
Feb 22 2024
Waiver of right of respondent United States of America to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 23 2024
Motion of counsel for petitioner to dismiss the petition for a writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 46.2 filed.
Main Document
Other
Mar 18 2024
Petition Dismissed - Rule 46.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul L. Nelson
Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defenders Office W.D. of Michigan
50 Louis Street NW
Suite 300
Grand Rapids, MI 49503
paul_nelson@fd.org
616-742-7420
Party name: Bryan Alan Kennert
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##