Docket for 23-6755 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Nov 30 2023 | Application (23A508) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 13, 2023 to February 11, 2024, submitted to Justice Kagan. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Dec 06 2023 | Application (23A508) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 11, 2024. | | | Feb 09 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 15, 2024) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Mar 07 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 15, 2024 to April 15, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Mar 08 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 15, 2024. | | | Apr 09 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 15, 2024 to April 25, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Apr 11 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 25, 2024. | | | Apr 25 2024 | Brief of William Gittere, et al. in opposition submitted. | | Main DocumentProof of Service |
|