Docket for 23-6702
|
Dec 11 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 11, 2024) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Feb 13 2024 | Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed. | | Main Document | Feb 15 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/1/2024. | | | Feb 26 2024 | Response Requested. (Due March 27, 2024) | | | Mar 18 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 27, 2024 to April 29, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Mar 20 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 29, 2024. | | | Apr 18 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 29, 2024 to May 16, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Apr 19 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 16, 2024. | | |
|