SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 23-669
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 23-669
Title:
Massachusetts Coastal Railroad LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
Chad Marsh
Docketed:
December 21, 2023
Lower Ct:
Supreme Judicial Court of Massachusetts
Case Numbers:
(SJC-13366)
Decision Date:
August 14, 2023
Rehearing Denied:
September 18, 2023
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Dec 18 2023
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 22, 2024)
Petition
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jan 12 2024
Waiver of right of respondent Chad Marsh to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 24 2024
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2024.
Jan 29 2024
Response Requested. (Due February 28, 2024)
Feb 02 2024
Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 28, 2024 to March 29, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 05 2024
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 29, 2024.
Mar 29 2024
Brief of respondent Chad Marsh in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Apr 08 2024
Letter from former counsel of record for petitioner submitted.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Apr 15 2024
Reply of petitioners Massachusetts Coastal Railroad LLC, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Apr 17 2024
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2024.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Alvin Saul Nathanson
Counsel of Record
Nathanson & Goldberg, PC
183 State Street, 5th floor
Boston, MA 02109
asn@natgolaw.com
6172104800
Party name: Massachusetts Coastal Railroad LLC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Raven Moeslinger
Counsel of Record
Law Office of Nicholas F. Ortiz, P.C.
One Boston Place
Suite 2600
Boston, MA 02108
rm@mass-legal.com
617-338-9400
Party name: Chad Marsh
Nandan Maheshchandra Joshi
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20009
NJOSHI@CITIZEN.ORG
(202) 588-1000
Party name: Chad Marsh
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##