Docket for 23-6451 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Nov 21 2023 | Application (23A472) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 4, 2023 to February 1, 2024, submitted to Justice Alito. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Nov 28 2023 | Application (23A472) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until January 8, 2024. | | | Jan 08 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 9, 2024) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Jan 10 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 9, 2024 to March 11, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jan 11 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 11, 2024. | | | Feb 27 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 11, 2024 to April 10, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Feb 29 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 10, 2024. | | | Apr 10 2024 | Brief of respondent Bobby Lumpkin, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Apr 19 2024 | Reply of petitioner Travis Dwight Green filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Apr 24 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2024. | | |
|