Docket for 23-6384
|
Nov 06 2023 | Application (23A414) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 26, 2023 to December 27, 2023, submitted to Justice Gorsuch. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Nov 09 2023 | Application (23A414) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until December 27, 2023. | | | Dec 26 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 29, 2024) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Jan 04 2024 | Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed. | | Main Document | Jan 11 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2024. | | | Jan 18 2024 | Response Requested. (Due February 20, 2024) | | | Feb 15 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 20, 2024 to March 21, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Feb 16 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 21, 2024. | | | Feb 21 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 21, 2024 to April 22, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Feb 22 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 22, 2024. | | | Apr 10 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 22, 2024 to May 6, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Apr 11 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 6, 2024. | | |
|