Docket for 23-6244
|
Oct 19 2023 | Application (23A363) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 9, 2023 to December 9, 2023, submitted to Justice Gorsuch. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | Oct 23 2023 | Application (23A363) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until December 11, 2023. | | | Dec 11 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 12, 2024) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Jan 02 2024 | Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed. | | Main Document | Jan 04 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/19/2024. | | | Jan 09 2024 | Response Requested. (Due February 8, 2024) | | | Jan 31 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 8, 2024 to March 11, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Feb 01 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 11, 2024. | | | Feb 28 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 11, 2024 to April 10, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Feb 29 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 10, 2024. | | | Apr 01 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 10, 2024 to May 10, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Apr 02 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 10, 2024. | | |
|