Docket for 23-6160 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Sep 19 2023 | Application (23A273) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 1, 2023 to November 30, 2023, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions | Sep 29 2023 | Application (23A273) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until November 30, 2023. | | | Nov 30 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 3, 2024) | | PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service | Dec 13 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 3, 2024 to February 2, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Dec 15 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 2, 2024. | | | Feb 02 2024 | Brief of respondent Zac Pounds, Warden in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Feb 16 2024 | Reply of petitioner Kennath Artez Henderson filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Feb 22 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/15/2024. | | | Mar 18 2024 | Petition DENIED. | | | Apr 11 2024 | Petition for Rehearing filed. | | Main DocumentOtherProof of Service | Apr 17 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2024. | | |
|