Docket for 23-5964 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Aug 10 2023 | Application (23A134) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 3, 2023 to November 2, 2023, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh. | | Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions | Aug 16 2023 | Application (23A134) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until November 2, 2023. | | | Nov 02 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 6, 2023) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Nov 08 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 6, 2023 to January 5, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Nov 09 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 5, 2024. | | | Jan 05 2024 | Brief of respondent Zac Pounds, Warden in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jan 22 2024 | Reply of petitioner William Glenn Rogers filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jan 25 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2024. | | | Feb 20 2024 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|