Docket for 23-5857 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Aug 01 2023 | Application (23A104) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 19, 2023 to October 19, 2023, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Aug 04 2023 | Application (23A104) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until October 19, 2023. | | | Oct 18 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 22, 2023) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | Nov 21 2023 | Brief of respondent Georgia in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Dec 04 2023 | Reply of petitioner Jeremy Moody filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Dec 14 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2024. | | | Dec 20 2023 | Record Requested. | | | Dec 27 2023 | Electronic record (contains sealed records) transmitted from Supreme Court of Georgia. | | | Jan 04 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/19/2024. | | | Jan 22 2024 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|