SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 23-5714 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 23-5714 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Cuhuatemoc Hinricky Peraita, Petitioner
v.
Alabama
Docketed:
October 4, 2023
Linked with 23A129
Lower Ct:
Court of Criminal Appeals of Alabama
Case Numbers:
(CR-17-1025)
Decision Date:
August 6, 2021
Rehearing Denied:
February 4, 2022
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
June 2, 2023
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Aug 14 2023
Application (23A129) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 31, 2023 to October 30, 2023, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Proof of Service
Aug 16 2023
Application (23A129) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until October 2, 2023.
Oct 02 2023
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 3, 2023)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Oct 24 2023
Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 3, 2023 to December 3, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 26 2023
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 4, 2023. See Rule 30.1.
Dec 04 2023
Brief of respondent Alabama in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Dec 20 2023
Reply of petitioner Cuhuatemoc Hinricky Peraita filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Dec 21 2023
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2024.
Jan 03 2024
Rescheduled.
Jan 08 2024
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2024.
Jan 16 2024
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Matthew J. Warren
Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005
mjwarren@sidley.com
202-736-8996
Party name: Cuhuatemoc Peraita
Attorneys for Respondent
James Roy Houts
Counsel of Record
501 Washington Ave
Montgomery, AL 36104
jhouts@ago.state.al.us
3343531513
Party name: Alabama
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##