SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 23-5592 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 23-5592 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Beau John Greene, Petitioner
v.
Arizona
Docketed:
September 15, 2023
Linked with 23A14
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Arizona
Case Numbers:
(CR-21-0082-PC)
Decision Date:
April 14, 2023
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jul 03 2023
Application (23A14) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 13, 2023 to September 11, 2023, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Proof of Service
Jul 07 2023
Application (23A14) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until September 11, 2023.
Sep 11 2023
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 16, 2023)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Petition
Appendix
Proof of Service
Oct 06 2023
Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 16, 2023 to December 15, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 10 2023
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 15, 2023.
Dec 13 2023
Brief of respondent Arizona in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Dec 28 2023
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2024.
Jan 16 2024
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Julie Singleton Hall
Counsel of Record
779 South Cody Loop Road
Oracle, AZ 85623
JulieSHall@hotmail.com
5208962890
Party name: Beau Greene
Attorneys for Respondent
Laura Patrice Chiasson
Counsel of Record
Arizona Attorney General
400 W. Congress, Suite S-215
Tucson, AZ 85701
LAURA.CHIASSON@AZAG.GOV
5206286520
Party name: State of Arizona
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##