Docket for 23-525
|
Nov 15 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 18, 2023) | | PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Dec 11 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 18, 2023 to January 17, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Dec 12 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 17, 2024, for all respondents. | | | Dec 13 2023 | Brief amici curiae of Public Lands Council and National Cattlemen's Beef Association filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Dec 14 2023 | Brief amici curiae of Roseburg Area Chamber of Commerce and NFIB Small Business Legal Center, Inc. filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Dec 15 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Dec 18 2023 | Brief amici curiae of Arizona Farm Bureau Federation, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Dec 18 2023 | Brief amici curiae of Representative Cliff Bentz and 28 members of Congress filed. VIDED. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Jan 10 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 17, 2024 to February 16, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jan 11 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 16, 2024, for all respondents. | | | Feb 16 2024 | Brief of Federal Respondents in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Feb 16 2024 | Brief of respondents Soda Mountain Wilderness Council, et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Mar 05 2024 | Reply of petitioners Murphy Company, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Mar 06 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/22/2024. | | | Mar 25 2024 | Petition DENIED. Justice Gorsuch and Justice Kavanaugh would grant the petition for a writ of certiorari. | | |
|