Nov 09 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 14, 2023) |
| PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Nov 21 2023 | Waiver of right of respondent Andes Petroleum Ecuador Limited to respond filed. |
| Main Document |
Nov 29 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2024. |
| |
Dec 04 2023 | Response Requested. (Due January 3, 2024) |
| |
Dec 07 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 3, 2024 to February 2, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Dec 08 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 2, 2024. |
| |
Feb 02 2024 | Brief of respondent Andes Petroleum Ecuador Limited in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count |
Feb 21 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/15/2024. |
| |
Feb 23 2024 | Joint motion to defer consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari. (Distributed) |
| Main Document |
Mar 18 2024 | Joint motion to defer consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. |
| |
Apr 12 2024 | Motion to dismiss the case pursuant to Rule 46 filed by petitioner. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Apr 22 2024 | Petition Dismissed - Rule 46. |
| |