SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 23-470
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 23-470
Title:
Kimberly Bruce, aka Kimberly A. Bruce, aka Kimberly Antrell Bruce, Petitioner
v.
Citigroup, Inc., et al.
Docketed:
November 3, 2023
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
Case Numbers:
(22-1000)
Decision Date:
August 2, 2023
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Oct 31 2023
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 4, 2023)
Petition
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Dec 04 2023
Waiver of right of respondent Citigroup, Inc., et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 06 2023
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2024.
Jan 08 2024
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
George Fortune Carpinello
Counsel of Record
30 South Pearl Street
Albany, NY 12207
gcarpinello@bsfllp.com
(518) 434-0600
Party name: Kimberly Bruce
Attorneys for Respondents
Eamon Paul Joyce
Counsel of Record
787 7th Avenue
New York, NY 10019
ejoyce@sidley.com
212 839 5300
Party name: Citigroup, Inc., et al.
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##