SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 23-370
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 23-370
Title:
Paul Erlinger, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:
October 6, 2023
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
Case Numbers:
(22-1926)
Decision Date:
August 10, 2023
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Oct 04 2023
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 6, 2023)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Oct 17 2023
Brief for the United States filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Oct 23 2023
Reply of petitioner Paul Erlinger filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Oct 24 2023
Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner.
Main Document
Oct 24 2023
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2023.
Nov 13 2023
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/17/2023.
Nov 20 2023
Petition GRANTED.
Nov 21 2023
D. Nick Harper, Esquire, of Washington, D. C., is invited to brief and argue this case, as amicus curiae, in support of the judgment below.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael R. Dreeben
Counsel of Record
O’Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 Eye Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006
MDREEBEN@OMM.COM
202-383-5400
Party name: Paul Erlinger
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Nick Harper
Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn
1050 Connecticut Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036-5306
nharper@gibsondunn.com
202-887-3534
Party name: Court-appointed amicus curiae in support of the judgment below
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##