Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 23-235
RSS Feed Print Notify Me
Search documents in this case:
No. 23-235
Title:Food and Drug Administration, et al., Petitioners
v.
Alliance for Hippocratic Medicine, et al.
Docketed:September 12, 2023
Linked with 23A300, 23A712
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-10362)
   Decision Date:August 16, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 08 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 12, 2023)
PetitionAppendixProof of Service
Sep 29 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 12, 2023 to November 9, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 29 2023Application (23A300) to file consolidated brief in opposition in excess of word limits, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 02 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 9, 2023.
Oct 07 2023Application (23A300) to file consolidated brief in opposition in excess of word limits granted by Justice Alito. The consolidated brief in opposition may not exceed 13,500 words.
Oct 12 2023Brief amici curiae of Over 600 State Legislators filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 12 2023Brief amici curiae of American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 12 2023Brief amici curiae of Food and Drug Law Scholars filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 12 2023Brief amici curiae of Pharmaceutical Companies, Executives, and Investors filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 12 2023Brief amici curiae of Patient and Provider Advocacy Organizations filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 12 2023Brief amici curiae of National Association of Nurse Practitioners in Women's Health, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 12 2023Brief amicus curiae of GenBioPro, Inc. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 12 2023Brief amici curiae of Local Governments and Local Government Leaders filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 12 2023Brief amici curiae of The City of New York, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 12 2023Brief amici curiae of 257 Members of Congress filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 12 2023Brief amici curiae of New York, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 12 2023Brief amici curiae of Doctors for America and The Reproductive Health Coalition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 12 2023Brief amicus curiae of Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 12 2023Brief amici curiae of Religious Coalition for Reproductive Choice, et al. filed. (10/26/23) VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 09 2023Brief of respondents Alliance for Hippocratic Medicine, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 15 2023Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner.
Main Document
Nov 21 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2023.
Nov 21 2023Reply of petitioners US Food and Drug Administration, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 13 2023Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 23-236 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument.
Dec 13 2023Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 23-235. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 23-235. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Jan 22 2024Motion for leave to intervene filed by Missouri, et al. VIDED.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jan 23 2024Brief of Federal Petitioners filed. VIDED
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 23 2024Motion for leave to intervene filed by Gregory J. Roden as Next Friend of Americans en ventre sa mere. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 23 2024Joint appendix filed.(Volumes I and II) VIDED.
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Jan 23 2024Brief of petitioner Danco Laboratories, LLC filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2024SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, March 26, 2024. VIDED.
Jan 30 2024Brief amicus curiae of Physicians for Reproductive Health filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 30 2024Application (23A712) to file respondents' brief on the merits in excess of the word limit, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 30 2024Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2024Brief amici curiae of Reproductive Freedom Alliance filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2024Brief amici curiae of 237 Reproductive Health, Rights, and Justice Organizations filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2024Brief amici curiae of The City of New York and NYC Health + Hospitals, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2024Brief amici curiae of American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2024Brief amici curiae of Doctors for America and The Reproductive Health Coalition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2024Brief amicus curiae of AANHPI, Black, and Immigrant Women's Organizations filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 30 2024Brief amici curiae of Legal Voice, the National Domestic Violence Hotline, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 30 2024Brief amici curiae of Pharmaceutical Companies, Executives, and Investors filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2024Brief amicus curiae of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2024Brief amici curiae of Food and Drug Law Scholars filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2024Brief amici curiae of Freedom from Religion Foundation, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2024Brief amici curiae of American Psychological Association, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2024Brief amici curiae of Over 640 State Legislators filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2024Brief amici curiae of Professors David S. Cohen, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2024Brief amici curiae of Patient and Provider Advocacy Organizations filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2024Brief amicus curiae of Women's Bar Association of the District of Columbia filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2024Brief amicus curiae of Medical Students for Choice filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2024Brief amici curiae of National Association of Nurse Practitioners in Women's Health, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2024Brief amici curiae of National Council of Jewish Women, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2024Brief amicus curiae of GenBioPro, Inc. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2024Brief amici curiae of 263 Members of Congress filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2024Brief amicus curiae of Honeybee Health, Inc. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2024Brief amici curiae of Local Governments and Local Government Leaders filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2024Brief amicus curiae of Association of American Medical Colleges filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2024Brief amicus curiae of Professor F. Andrew Hessick filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2024Brief amici curiae of Women Who Have Obtained Medication Abortion Via Telemedicine filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 30 2024Brief amici curiae of Former U.S. Department of Justice Officials filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2024Brief amici curiae of Disability Rights Education & Defense Fund, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2024Brief amici curiae of New York, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2024Brief amici curiae of Former Military Officials, Civilian National Security Leaders, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2024Brief amici curiae of Public Citizen, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2024Brief amicus curiae of Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America (Feb. 6, 2024) filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 30 2024Amicus brief of Over 300 Reproductive Health Researchers submitted.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 31 2024Motion of Missouri, et al. for leave to intervene and motion of Gregory J. Roden, as Next Friend of Americans en ventre sa mere for leave to intervene DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2024.
Jan 31 2024Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit.
Feb 01 2024Response in opposition to motion of Missouri, et al. for leave to intervene from petitioners US Food and Drug Administration, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 01 2024Response in opposition to motion of Missouri, et al. for leave to intervene from petitioner Danco Laboratories, LLC filed. VIDED (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Feb 01 2024Motion for leave to file amici brief out of time filed by Former Commissioners of the U.S. Food and Drug Administration. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 02 2024Motion for leave to file amicus brief out of time filed by American Bar Association. VIDED.
Proof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 06 2024Reply in support of motion of Missouri, et al. to intervene filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 08 2024Application (23A712) granted by Justice Alito to file respondents' brief on the merits in excess of the word limit provided that the brief does not exceed 18,000 words.
Feb 09 2024Sealed record received electronically from the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas and available with the Clerk.
Feb 13 2024Public electronic record on appeal received from the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas (one DVD) and available with the Clerk.
Feb 13 2024Record received from the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit. The record is electronic and is available on PACER.
Feb 14 2024CIRCULATED
Feb 20 2024Motion for leave to file amicus brief out of time filed by American Bar Association DENIED.
Feb 20 2024Motion for leave to file amici brief out of time filed by Former Commissioners of the U.S. Food and Drug Administration GRANTED.
Feb 20 2024Motion for leave to intervene filed by Missouri, et al. DENIED.
Feb 20 2024Motion for leave to intervene filed by Gregory J. Roden as Next Friend of Americans en ventre sa mere DENIED.
Feb 22 2024Brief of respondents Alliance for Hippocratic Medicine, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2024Brief amicus curiae of Dr. Allan Sawyer filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain Document
Feb 26 2024Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law & Justice filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2024Amicus brief of World Faith Foundation and Institute for Faith and Family submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 27 2024Brief amicus curiae of Students for Life of America filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2024Amicus brief of Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2024Amicus brief of Business Leaders submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2024Amicus brief of Ethics and Public Policy Center submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2024Amicus brief of Family Policy Alliance and State Family Policy Councils submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2024Amicus brief of Priests for Life submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2024Amicus brief of Women and Families Harmed by Mifepristone and Former Abortion Providers submitted.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jessica Lynn Ellsworth
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US, LLP
555 13th Street, N. W.
Washington, DC 20004

JESSICA.ELLSWORTH@HOGANLOVELLS.COM
202-637-5886
Party name: Danco Laboratories, LLC
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: US Food and Drug Administration, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Erin Morrow Hawley
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street, NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

EHAWLEY@ADFLEGAL.ORG
202-393-8690
Party name: Alliance for Hippocratic Medicine, et al.
Other
William Bock III
    Counsel of Record
Kroger, Gardis & Regas, LLP
111 Monument Circle
Suite 900
Indianapolis, IN 46204-5125

wbock@kgrlaw.com
(317) 777-7412
Party name: Students for Life of America
James L. Hirsen
    Counsel of Record
505 S. Villa Real Drive
Suite 101
Anaheim Hills, CA 92807

james@jameshirsen.com
(714) 283-8880
Party name: World Faith Foundation and Institute for Faith and Family
Robert Joseph Muise
    Counsel of Record
American Freedom Law Center
PO Box 131098
Ann Arbor, MI 48113

rmuise@americanfreedomlawcenter.org
7346353756
Party name: Priests for Life
Michael Steven Overing
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Michael S. Overing, APC
790 E. Colorado Blvd., Ste. 320
Pasadena, CA 91101

movering@digitalmedialaw.com
6265648600
Party name: Dr. Allan Sawyer
Linda Boston Schlueter
    Counsel of Record
Trinity Legal Center
1150 N. Loop 1604 W.
Suite 108-208
San Antonio, TX 78248

TLC4Linda@aol.com
210-274-5274
Party name: Women and Families Harmed by Mifepristone and Former Abortion Providers
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
2025468890
Party name: American Center for Law & Justice
Howard Nathan Slugh
    Counsel of Record
Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty
2400 Virginia Ave NW
APT C619
Washington DC, DC 20037

HSLUGH@JCRL.ORG
19543289461
Party name: Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty
Randall L. Wenger
    Counsel of Record
Independence Law Center
23 N. Front Street, First Floor
Harrisburg, PA 17101

rwenger@indlawcenter.org
717-657-4990
Party name: Family Policy Alliance and State Family Policy Councils
John Marc Wheat
    Counsel of Record
Advancing American Freedom, Inc.
801 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Suite 930
Washington, DC 20004-2729

MWHEAT@ADVANCINGAMERICANFREEDOM.COM
(202) 780-4848
Party name: Advancing American Freedom, Inc.
Jonathan Radford Whitehead
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Jonathan R. Whitehead, LLC
229 SE Douglas St., Ste 210
Lee's Summit, MO 64063

JON@WHITEHEADLAWLLC.COM
18163988305
Party name: Business Leaders
Jessica Ring Amunson
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

JAMUNSON@JENNER.COM
202-639-6000
Party name: American Psychological Association, National Association of Social Workers
Noah Butsch BaronAsian Americans Advancing Justice-AAJC
1620 L Street NW
Suite 1050
Washington, DC 20036

noah.b.baron@gmail.com
202-868-0396
Party name: Asian Americans Advancing Justice-AAJC
Candace Nicole BeckWomen's Bar Ass'n of the District of Columbia
2800 Eisenhower Avenue, Suite 210
Alexandria, VA 22314

admin@wbadc.org
2026398880
Party name: Women's Bar Association of the District of Columbia
Candace Nicole Beck
    Counsel of Record
Women's Bar Ass'n of the District of Columbia
2800 Eisenhower Avenue, Suite 210
Alexandria, VA 22314

admin@wbadc.org
2026398880
Party name: Women's Bar Association of the District of Columbia
Amanda Shafer Berman
    Counsel of Record
Crowell & Moring LLP
1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

aberman@crowell.com
2026242500
Party name: Over 600 State Legislators
Boris Bershteyn
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
One Manhattan West
New York, NY 10001-8602

BORIS.BERSHTEYN@SKADDEN.COM
212-735-3000
Party name: 257 Members of Congress
Boris Bershteyn
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
One Manhattan West
New York, NY 10001-8602

BORIS.BERSHTEYN@SKADDEN.COM
212-735-3000
Party name: 263 Members of Congress
Vanessa Kay Burrows
    Counsel of Record
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
900 G Street NW
Washington, DC 20001

vanessa.burrows@stblaw.com
(212) 455-2000
Party name: Women Who Have Obtained Medication Abortion Via Telemedicine
David Samuel Cohen
    Counsel of Record
Thomas R. Kline School Of Law
Drexel University
3320 Market St.
Philadelphia, PA 19104

dsc39@drexel.edu
215-571-4714
Party name: Professors David S. Cohen and Rachel Rebouché
Richard Paul Dearing
    Counsel of Record
City of New York
100 Church Street
New York, NY 10007

RDEARING@LAW.NYC.GOV
(212) 356-2500
Party name: The City of New York and NYC Health + Hospitals, The County of Santa Clara, and Four Other Local Jurisdictions
Joshua Michael Divine
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Missouri Attorney General
Solicitor General
207 West High Street
Jefferson City, MO 65101

josh.divine@ago.mo.gov
573-751-8870
Party name: Missouri, Idaho, and Kansas
Patrick C Elliott
    Counsel of Record
Freedom From Religion Foundation
PO BOX 750
Madison, WI 53701

pelliott@ffrf.org
6082568900
Party name: Freedom from Religion Foundation and American Atheists
John Patrick Elwood
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

JOHN.ELWOOD@ARNOLDPORTER.COM
(202) 942-5992
Party name: GenBioPro, Inc.
Charles W. FillmoreThe Fillmore Law Firm, LLP
201 Main St. Suite 700
Fort Worth, TX 76102

CHAD@FILLMOREFIRM.COM
8173322351
Party name: Ethics and Public Policy Center
Eugene Martin Gelernter
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
1133 Avenue of the Amer.icas
New York, NY 10036

emgelernter@pbwt.com
(212) 336-2000
Party name: National Council of Jewish Women, et al.
Melissa Goodman
    Counsel of Record
Center on Reproductive Health, Law, and Policy
UCLA School of Law
1060 Veteran Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90095

goodmanm@law.ucla.edu
(212) 373-3000
Party name: Over 300 Reproductive Health Researchers
Matthew Prairie Gordon
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Cole LLP
1201 Third Avenue, Suite 4900
Seattle, WA 98101

MGORDON@PERKINSCOIE.COM
2063593552
Party name: Legal Voice, the National Domestic Violence Hotline, et al.
Stephanie Leigh Gutwein
    Counsel of Record
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
300 N. Meridian St., Suite 2500
Indianapolis, IN 46204

stephanie.gutwein@faegredrinker.com
317-237-0300
Party name: Honeybee Health, Inc.
Douglas Harry Hallward-Driemeier
    Counsel of Record
Ropes & Gray, LLP
2099 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006-6807

DOUGLAS.HALLWARD-DRIEMEIER@ROPESGRAY.COM
202-508-4776
Party name: Association of American Medical Colleges
Lindsay C. Harrison
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

LHARRISON@JENNER.COM
(202)-639-6000
Party name: 237 Reproductive Health, Rights, and Justice Organizations
F. Andrew Hessick III
    Counsel of Record
160 Ridge Road
Chapel Hill , NC 27599

AHESSICK@EMAIL.UNC.EDU
(202) 374-4634
Party name: Professor F. Andrew Hessick
Christopher Theodore Holinger
    Counsel of Record
Davis Law. PLC
555 Belaire Ave, Suite 340
Chesapeake, VA 23320

cholinger@davislawplc.com
7574102293
Party name: Robertson Center for Constitutional Law
Carmen Gloria Iguina Gonzalez
    Counsel of Record
Kaplan Hecker & Fink LLP
1050 K Street NW
Suite 1040
Washington, DC 20001

ciguina@kaplanhecker.com
212-763-0883
Party name: Former Military Officials, Civilian National Security Leaders, and Vet Voice Foundation
Jayme Alyse Jonat
    Counsel of Record
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP
425 Lexington Avenue
14th Floor
New York, NY 10017

jjonat@hsgllp.com
646-837-8455
Party name: Medical Students for Choice
Julia Heather Kaye
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
125 Broad Street, 18th Floor
New York, NY 10004

jkaye@aclu.org
212-549-2663
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, et al.
Robert Allen Long Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling, LLP
One CityCenter
850 Tenth St., NW
Washington, DC 20001

RLONG@COV.COM
202-662-5612
Party name: Food and Drug Law Scholars
Janice Marie Mac Avoy
    Counsel of Record
Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson LLP
One New York Plaza
New York, NY 10004

JANICE.MACAVOY@FRIEDFRANK.COM
212-859-8182
Party name: Physicians for Reproductive Health
Jonathan B. Miller
    Counsel of Record
Public Rights Project
490 43rd Street, #115
Oakland, CA 94609

JON@PUBLICRIGHTSPROJECT.ORG
(510) 738-6788
Party name: Local Governments and Local Government Leaders
Christopher John Morten
    Counsel of Record
Columbia Law School
Morningside Heights Legal Services, Inc.
435 West 116th Street
New York, NY 10027

CJM2002@COLUMBIA.EDU
2128544291
Party name: Doctors for America and The Reproductive Health Coalition
Gregory J. Roden
    Counsel of Record
4951 W. 77th Street, #1
Edina, MN 55435

greg.roden@comcast.net
952-388-3088
Party name: Americans En Ventre Sa Mere
Nicolas Anthony Sansone
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street NW
Washington, DC 20009

nsansone@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen; Center for Science in the Public Interest
Jaime Ann Santos
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter LLP
1900 N St. NW
Washington, DC 20036

JSANTOS@GOODWINLAW.COM
2023464034
Party name: Reproductive Freedom Alliance
Alan Evan Schoenfeld
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer, Cutler, Pickering, Hale and Dorr, LLP
7 World Trade Center
250 Greenwich Street
New York, NY 10007

alan.schoenfeld@wilmerhale.com
(212) 230-8800
Party name: Former U.S. Department of Justice Officials
William Barnett Schultz
    Counsel of Record
Zuckerman Spaeder LLP
1800 M St. NW Ste. 1000
Washington, DC 20036

wschultz@zuckerman.com
(202) 778-1800
Party name: Former Commissioners of the U.S. Food and Drug Administration
Shannon Rose Selden
    Counsel of Record
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
66 Hudson Boulevard
New York, NY 10001

SRSELDEN@DEBEVOISE.COM
212-909-6000
Party name: American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, et al.
Niyati Shah
    Counsel of Record
Asian Americans Advancing Justice-AAJC
1620 L Street NW, Suite 1050
Washington, DC 20036

NSHAH@ADVANCINGJUSTICE-AAJC.ORG
2028151098
Party name: Asian Americans Advancing Justice-AAJC
Niyati Shah
    Counsel of Record
Asian Americans Advancing Justice-AAJC
1620 L Street NW, Suite 1050
Washington, DC 20036

NSHAH@ADVANCINGJUSTICE-AAJC.ORG
2022962399
Party name: AANHPI, Black, and Immigrant Women's Organizations
Mary L. Smith
    Counsel of Record
321 North Clark Street
Chicago, IL 60654

marysmith828@hotmail.com
312-988-5000
Party name: American Bar Association
Samuel Spital
    Counsel of Record
NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.
40 Rector Street, 5th Floor
New York, NY 10006

SSPITAL@NAACPLDF.ORG
2129652200
Party name: NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.
Eva A. Temkin
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding LLP
1700 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20006

ETEMKIN@KSLAW.COM
(202) 737-0500
Party name: Pharmaceutical Companies, Executives, and Investors
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

BARBARA.UNDERWOOD@AG.NY.GOV
212-416-8016
Party name: New York, et al.
Maria Michelle Uzeta
    Counsel of Record
Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund
3075 Adeline Street, Suite 210
Berkeley, CA 94703

muzeta@dredf.org
510-644-2555
Party name: Disability Rights Education & Defense Fund, et al.
Caroline Lewis Wolverton
    Counsel of Record
Akin, Gump, Strauss, Hauer & Feld LLP
2001 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

cwolverton@akingump.com
202-887-4107
Party name: Patient and Provider Advocacy Organizations
Jonathan K. Youngwood
    Counsel of Record
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett, LLP
425 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10017

JYoungwood@STBLAW.com
2124552000
Party name: National Association of Nurse Practitioners in Women's Health, American College of Nurse-Midwives, American Academy of Physician Associates, and Association of Physician Associates in Obstetrics and Gynecology
David Meir Zionts
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burlington LLP
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

dzionts@cov.com
(202) 662-5987
Party name: Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543