Docket for 23-1096
|
Apr 05 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 9, 2024) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 15 2024 | Waiver of right of respondent Colorado to respond filed. | | Main Document | Apr 17 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2024. | | | Apr 23 2024 | Response Requested. (Due May 23, 2024) | | | Apr 24 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 23, 2024 to July 8, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Apr 26 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 8, 2024. | | |
|