Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22O65
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22O65
Title:State of Texas, Plaintiff
v.
State of New Mexico
Docketed:June 27, 1974
Lower Ct:
   Case Numbers:
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 16 1960Motion of the River Master for approval of fees and expenses received.
Jun 27 1974Motion for leave to file a bill of complaint filed.
Aug 27 1974Motion for appointment of Special Master filed.
Aug 28 1974Brief in opposition of State of New Mexico filed.
Oct 10 1974Memorandum for the U.S. filed.
Oct 16 1974Response to the memorandum of U.S. requested.
Nov 01 1974Response of the State of New Mexico to the memorandum U.S. filed.
Nov 18 1974Application of the State of Texas for an extension to file response to memorandum of U.S. filed and order granting same until 1-5-75. (Burger, C.J.)
Jan 03 1975Brief of State of Texas in response to New Mexico's opposition and to memorandum of the U.S.
Jan 24 1975Above report received and order filed. Motion for leave to intervene GRANTED.
Mar 12 1975Supplemental memorandum to the U.S. filed.
Apr 21 1975Motion for leave to file bill of complaint GRANTED, defendant is alloted sixty days to answer. Douglas, J. OUT.
Apr 21 1975Motion for leave to file an bill of complaint GRANTED.
Jun 19 1975Answer of State of New Mexico filed.
Aug 20 1975Motion of U.S. for leave to intervene filed.
Sep 12 1975Response of New Mexico to motion of U.S. for leave to intervene filed.
Oct 02 1975Motion of U.S. for leave to intervene DISTRIBUTED.
Oct 09 1975Response of U.S. to State of New Mexico's objection complaint in intervention filed. (D)
Oct 28 1975Motion of U.S. for leave to intervene and motion for appointment of Special Master DISTRIBUTED. 10-31
Nov 11 1975ORDERED that Honorable Jean Sala Breitenstein, Senior Judge for the USCA-10 be appointed to Special Master in this case. Motion of the U.S. for leave to intervene is referred to the Special Master. Douglas, J., OUT.
Jan 07 1976Report of Special Master on Motion of United States for leave to intervene as plaintiff filed.
Aug 29 1977Report of the Special Master on affirmative defenses of New Mexico filed.
Oct 03 1977Report of Special Master order filed.
Sep 14 1979Report of Special Master on Obligation of New Mexico to Texas Under the Pecos River Compact received.
Oct 15 1979The Report of the Special Master on Obligation of New Mexico to Texas under the Pecos River Compact is received and ordered filed. Exceptions, if any, together with supporting briefs to the Report may be filed by the parties within 45 days. Replies, if any, with supporting briefs, to such exceptions may be filed within 30 days.
Nov 29 1979Objections of New Mexico to Report of the Special Master filed.
Nov 30 1979Objections of the State of Texas to the Report of the Special Master filed.
Dec 31 1979Texas' reply to New Mexico's objections to the Master's Report filed.
Feb 02 1980Memorandum for the United States filed. (D)
Feb 09 1980Motion of New Mexico to strike response of United States filed.
Feb 19 1980The motion of New Mexico to strike the response of the United States is DENIED. The alternative request to file a reply is GRANTED. The Objections to the Report of the Special Master on the obligations of New Mexico to Texas under the Pecos River Compact are set for oral argument in due course.
Feb 29 1980CIRCULATED.
Mar 24 1980ARGUED. (on objections to the Report of Special Master)
May 19 1980Upon consideration of the Report filed October 15, 1979, by Senior Judge Jean S. Breitenstein, Special Master, and the Exceptions thereto, and on consideration of briefs and oral arguments thereon, it is ADJUDGED, ordered, and decreed, that all Exceptions are overruled, the Report is in all respects confirmed, and the ruling of the Special Master on the "1946 condition" as that term appears in Artx. 11 (g) and 111 (a) of the Pecos River Compact is approved. (Per Curiam Opinion). Dissenting opinion by Stevens, J.
Jun 03 1980Petition for rehearing filed.
Jun 30 1980Rehearing DENIED.
Nov 30 1981The order of November 11, 1975 is amended to add the word LEGAL to the second sentence of the second paragraph to the order appointing the Special Master. (see order).
Sep 28 1982Report of the Special Master received.
Oct 18 1982The report of the Special Master is received and ordered filed. Exceptions to the Report, with supporting briefs, may be filed by the parties within 45 days. Replies to such Exceptions, with supporting briefs, may be filed within 30.
Dec 01 1982Exceptions to the Report of the Special Master by New Mexico filed.
Dec 03 1982Exceptions to the Report of the Special Master filed by the United States.
Dec 03 1982Exceptions to the Report of the Special Master filed by the State of Texas.
Jan 05 1983Reply brief of the State of New Mexico to Texas' and the U.S.' exceptions and briefs in support of exceptions to the Report and Recommendations of the Special Master filed.
Jan 05 1983Statement of receipts and disbursements by Special Master received.
Jan 08 1983Texas' reply to the Exceptions of the United States and New Mexico are filed.
Jan 24 1983The Exceptions to the Report of the Special Master are set for oral argument in due course.
Feb 15 1983CIRCULATED.
Mar 28 1983Record filed. (6 filed)
Mar 30 1983ARGUED.
Jun 17 1983Sustained in part. Overruled in part. Returned to the Special Mastser for determination of the unresolved issues framed in his Pre-Trial Order, in a manner consistent with this opinion.
Feb 06 1984Report and Recommendation of Special Master received.
Feb 27 1984The Report of the Special Master is received and order filed. Excpetions to the Report, with supporting briefs, may be filed by the parties within 45 days. Replies thereto, with supporting briefs, may be filed within 30 days. The request of the Special Master to be discharged is granted and it is ordered that Honorable Jean Sala Breitenstein is discharged as the Special Master in this case.
Mar 09 1984Waiver of the United States of right to file Exceptions to the Report of the Special Master filed.
Apr 12 1984Exceptions filed to the Report of the Special Master by New Mexico, of, in the alternative, motion to remand filed.
May 14 1984Reply by Texas to Excpetions of the Special Master filed by New Mexico filed. (D)
Jun 11 1984The motion of New Mexico to remand the case to the Special Master is denied. The Exception of New Mexico to the Report of the Special Master is overruled. The Report and Recommendation of the Special Master is approved.
Jun 22 1984STRICKEN from above conference.
Jul 02 1984The Honorable Jean Sala Breitensten, whose long and invaluable service to the Court in this case is deeply appreciated, has requested that he be relieved of his duties as Special Master, and the Court having granted that request, it is necessary that a Special Master be appointed to conclude this case. It is therefore ordered that Charles J. Meyer of Denver, Colorado, be appointed to Special Master in this case with authority to fix the pleadings and to direct subsequent proceedings, and with authority to summon witnesses, issue subpoenas, and take such evidence as may be introduced and such as he may deem it necessary to call for. The Master is directed to submit such reports as he may deem appropriate. The compensation of the Special Master, the allowances to him, the compensation paid to his legal, technical, stenographic, and clerical assistants, the cost of printing his report, and all other proper expenses shall be charged against and borne by the parties in such proportion as the Court may hereafter direct.
Jul 30 1984Oath of the Special Master received.
Dec 20 1985Motion of the Special Master for interim fees and disbursements filed.
Feb 24 1986The motion of the Special Master for allowance of interim fees and disbursements is granted and a total of $34,213.09 is allowed. Chief Justice Burger, with whom Blackmun and Renquist, J.J., join, dissenting.
Jul 29 1986Report of the Special Master received.
Oct 06 1986The Report of the Special Master is received and ordered filed. Exceptions to the Report, with supporting briefs, may be filed by the parties within 45 days. Replies thereto, if any, may be mailed within 30 days. The motion of the Special Master for award and interim fee allowance is granted. Scalia, J., OUT.
Nov 06 1986Order extending time to file the Exceptions and supporting brief to Report of Special Master granted for all parties to and including December 19, 1986.
Dec 18 1986Brief, amici curiae of The Incorporated Munincipalities of Alamogordo, Artesia, et al., in support of New Mexico filed.
Dec 18 1986Exception of State of Texas to Report of the Special Master and Brief in support filed.
Dec 20 1986Exception of New Mexico to the Report of the Special Master and Brief in support filed.
Jan 14 1987Order extending time to file 60 printed copies of Texas' reply to New Mexico's Exceptions to the Report of the Special Master until January 13, 1987.
Jan 20 1987Reply by Texas filed.
Jan 20 1987Brief, amici curiae, of Red Bluff Water Power Control District in support of Recommendations of the Special Master filed.
Feb 23 1987The Exceptions to the Report of the Special Master are set for oral argument in due course.
Mar 02 1987The motion of City of Alamogordo, New Mexico, et al., for leave to participate in oral argument as amici curiae, for divided argument, and for additional time for oral argument is DENIED.
Apr 29 1987ARGUED.
Jun 08 1987On Exceptions to the Report of the Special Master. Exceptions to the Report of the Special Master sustained in part and overruled in part. Decree entered. The case is remanded to the Special Master. The Court retains jurisdiction of this suit for the purpose of order, direction, or modification of the decree, or any supplementary decree, that may at any time be deemed proper in relation to the subject matter controversy. Opinion by Justice White; Justice Stevens took no part in the conversation of this case.
Nov 30 1987Report of the Special Master received.
Dec 07 1987The Report of the Special Master is received and order filed. Exceptions to the Report, with supporting briefs, may be filed by the parties within 45 days. Replies thereto, with supporting briefs, may be filed within 30 days.
Jan 11 1988Motion for allowance of interim fees and disbursement filed.
Jan 20 1988Order extending time to file exceptions and brief in support of exceptions to the Report of the Special Master until January 26, 1988. This extension applies to all parties. No additional request for an extension of time will be entertained by the Clerk.
Jan 27 1988Exceptions to the Report of the Special Master filed by New Mexico.
Jan 29 1988Waiver of Texas to Exceptions to the Report of the Special Master filed.
Feb 08 1988Nomination for appointment of River Master pursuant to opinion of this Court on June 8, 1987, filed.
Mar 02 1988Reply by Texas to Exceptions to the Report of Special Master filed.
Mar 11 1988Motion of New Mexico to file reply brief to Texas' reply.
Mar 21 1988The motion of the Special Master for allowance of interim fees and disbursements is granted. Dissenting opinion by Blackmun, J. Justice Stevens, OUT.
Mar 28 1988Motion of New Mexico for leave to file a reply brief is GRANTED. New Mexico's exceptions to the Report of the Special Master are overruled. The Report of the Special Master is approved and amended decree entered. United States dismissed from this proceeding without prejudice. Court retains jurisdiction of this suit. Opinion per curiam. Neil S. Grigg, of Fort Collins, Colorado, appointed River Master of the Pecos River. Justice Stevens took no part in the consideration or decision of this case.
Apr 07 1988Oath of River Master received.
Jul 12 1988Motion of the River Master for approval of fees and expenses filed.
Jul 23 1988New Mexico's motion to stay adoption of Pecos River Master's final report filed.
Jul 23 1988Application (A-88-116) for a stay of adoption of River Master's Final Report pending Special Master's determination of stateline departure 84-86, submitted to White, J.
Jul 23 1988Application (A-88-116) DENIED by White, J.
Aug 04 1988Response to the application (A88-166) filed by Texas.
Sep 12 1988Letter from River Master respecting oral presentation by state and other parties presented to Justice White and by him referred to the Court filed.
Oct 03 1988The motion of the River Master for approval of fees and expenses is granted and the River Master is awarded $14,085.35 for the period of March 28-June 30, 1988, to be paid equally by the parties.
Oct 12 1988Motion for allowance of fees and disbursements for the late Special Master filed.
Oct 12 1988Memorandum respecting status of case at the time of death of the Special Master filed.
Oct 18 1988It is ordered that D. Monte Pascoe, Esquire, of Denver, Colorado, be appointed Special Master in the place of Charles J. Meyers, deceased. The Special Master shall have authority to fix the time and conditions for the filling of additional pleadings and to direct subsequent proceedings, and with authority to summon witnesses, issue subpoenas, and take such evidence as may be introduced and such as he may deem it necessary to call for. The Special Master is directed to submit such reports as he may deem appropriate. The compensation paid to his report, and all other proper expenses, including travel expenses, shall be charged against and be bourne by the parties in such proportion as the Court may hereafter direct.
Oct 28 1988OATH OF SPECIAL MASTER RECEIVED
Oct 31 1988The motion for allowance of fees and disbursements on behalf of the late Charles J. Meyers, Special Master is granted and the allocation for total services and disbursements set forth in the motion is approved. The amount is to be paid equally by the parties. Stevens, J., OUT.
Jan 10 1989Motion of River Master for approval of fees and expenses filed.
Feb 21 1989The motion of the River Master for approval of fees and expenses is granted and the River Master is awarded $5,154.74 for the period July 1-December 31, 1998., to be paid equally by the parties.
Apr 12 1989Request of the River Master for approval of fees and expenses for the period January 1-March 31, 1989.
May 01 1989The motion of the River Master for approval of fees and expenses is granted and the River Master is awarded $7,168.53 for the period January 1- March 31, 1989, to be paid equally by the parties.
Jun 20 1989Final Report of the River Master received.
Jul 03 1989The Final Report of the Pecos River Master for accounting year 1989 is received and order filed.
Aug 07 1989Status Report by the Special Master received.
Oct 02 1989The motion of the River Master for approval of fees and expenses is granted and the River Master is awarded $4313.43 for the period April 1-June 30, 1989 to be equally paid by the parties.
Oct 05 1989Allowances of interim fees and disbursements by Special Master filed.
Oct 30 1989The motion of the Special Master for allowance of interim fees and disbursements is granted and the Special Master is awarded $55,936.76 to be paid equally by the parties.
Jan 07 1990Modification determination and grounds for such determination dated December 26, 1990 was received January 2, 1991.
Jan 16 1990Motion of the River Master for approval of fees and expenses received.
Jan 22 1990The motion of the River Master for approval of fees and expenses is granted and the River Master awarded $3761.73 for the period of July 1- December 31, 1989, to be paid equally by the parties.
Feb 07 1990Joint motion of stipulated judgement filed.
Feb 26 1990The Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Judgement is GRANTED.
Apr 12 1990Motion of River Master for approval of fees for period of January 1-March 21, 1990, to be paid equally by the parties.
Apr 23 1990The motion of the River Master for approval of fees is granted and the River Master is awarded $1215.00 for the period between January 1-March 31, 1990.
Jul 06 1990River Master's Final Report for Accounting Year 1990 filed.
Jul 18 1990Motion of the River Master for fees and expenses filed.
Oct 01 1990The Final Report of the River Master for Accounting Year 1990 is adopted. The motion for approval of fees and expenses is granted and the River Master is awarded $5,063.44 for the period April 1-June 30, 1990, to be paid equally by the parties.
Nov 19 1990Motion of the River Master for fees and expenses filed.
Dec 10 1990The motion of the River Master for approval of fees and expenses is granted and the River Master is awarded $2,638.52 for the period July 1- September 30, 1990, to be paid equally by the parties.
Jan 10 1991Motion of the River Master for compensation and reimbursement of expenses filed.
Jan 22 1991The motion of the River Master for approval of fees and expenses is granted and the River Master is awarded $4,451.32 for the period of October 1- December 31, 1990, to be paid equally by the parties.
Jan 24 1991Second motion of the Special Master for compensation and reimbursement of expenses filed.
Feb 19 1991ORDER: The second motion of the Special Master for compensation and reimbursement of expenses is granted and the Special Master is allowed a total of $30,391.20 for the period September 1, 1989 through January 23, 1991 to be paid equally by the parties. The request of the Special Master to be discharged is granted and Monte Pasco is hereby discharged with the thanks of the Court.
Apr 16 1991Motion of the River Master for fees and expenses filed.
Apr 29 1991ORDER: Motion of the River Master for approval of fees and expenses is granted and the River Master is awarded $7,732.95 for the period January 1- March 1, 1991, to be paid equally by the parties.
Jul 26 1991Motion of New Mexico to review River Master's final report for 1990.
Jul 29 1991Motion of River Master for fees and expenses filed.
Aug 08 1991Response of Texas to New Mexico's motion filed.
Aug 12 1991Record of proceedings before the River Master received.
Aug 23 1991Reply of New Mexico to the response filed by Texas filed.
Oct 07 1991ORDER: Motion of the River Master for approval of fees is granted and the River Master is awarded $10,705.20 for the period April 1, 1991- June 30, 1991, to be paid equally by the parties. The Motion of New Mexico to review the River Master's final report for water year 1990 is DENIED.
Oct 15 1991ORDER: Amendment to the March 28, 1988 order appointing the River Master: It is ordered that Neil S. Grigg be and he hereby is appointed River Master of the Pecos River for the purpose of performing the duties set forth in the Amended Decree of March 28, 1988. It is further ordered that the River Master shall have the power and authority to subpoena information or data, compiled in reasonable or usable form, which he deems necessary or desirable for the proper and efficient performance of his duties. It is further ordered that the RIver Master is allowed his necessary expenses including the cost of competent legal advice deemed by him to be necessary to carry out his duties, as well as reasonable fees for his services, statements for which shall be submitted quarterly to the Court for its approval. Upon Court approval, such statements will be paid by the States of New Mexico and Texas. It is further ordered that if the position of River Master becomes vacant during a recess of the Court, the Chief Justice shall have the authority to make a new designation which shall have the same effect as if originally made by the Court.
Jan 27 1992Motion of the River Master for approval of fees and expenses filed.
Feb 24 1992ORDER: Motion of the River Master for approval of fees and expenses is granted and the River Master is awarded $7,644.00 for the period October 1- December 31, 1992, to be paid equally by the parties.
May 12 1992Motion for approval of fees and expenses by the River Master filed.
Jun 01 1992ORDER: Motion of the River Master for approval of fees and expenses is GRANTED and the River Master is awarded $4208.44 for the period January 1- March 31, 1992, to be paid equally by the parties.
Jun 02 1992Final Report for Accounting Year 1991 by the River Master filed.
Sep 28 1992Motion of the River Master for approval of fees and expenses filed.
Oct 19 1992ORDER: Motion of the River Master for approval of fees and expenses is GRANTED and the River Master is awarded $14,388.53 for the period April 1- June 28, 1992, to be paid equally by the parties.
Nov 05 1992Motion of the River Master for approval of fees and expenses filed.
Nov 16 1992ORDER: Motion of the River Master for approval of fees and expenses is GRANTED and the River Master is awarded $8,082.13 for the period July 1- September 30, 1992, to be paid equally by the parties.
Dec 31 1992Modification determination of the River Master filed (see cover letter dated 12-29-92)
Jan 26 1993Motion of the River Master for award of compensation and fees files
Feb 22 1993ORDER: Motion of the River Master for approval of fees and expenses is GRANTED and the River Master is awarded $7,318.93 for the period Oct 1-Dec 31, 1992, to be paid equally by the parties.
May 17 1993Motion of River Master for award of fees and expenses filed.
May 24 1993ORDER: Motion of the River Master for approval of fees and expenses is GRANTED and the River Master is awarded $370.29 for the period January 1- March 31, 1993, to be paid equally by the parties.
Feb 22 1994ORDER: Motion of the River Master for approval of fees and expenses is GRANTED and the River Master is awarded $444.60 for the period October 1- December 31, 1994, to be paid equally by the parties.
May 05 1994Motion of River Master for award of fees and reimbursement of expenses filed.
Jun 13 1994ORDER: Motion of the River Master for approval of fees and expenses is GRANTED and the River Master is awarded $836.00 for the period January 1- March 31, 1994, to be paid equally by the parties.
Jun 27 1994Pecos River Master's Final Report for Accounting Year 1994 received.
Oct 03 1994ORDER: Motion of the River Master for approval of fees and expenses is GRANTED and the River Master is awarded $5,403.75 for the period April 1- June 30, 1994, to be paid equally by the parties.
Nov 14 1994Motion of River Master for award of fees and reimbursement of expenses paid.
Nov 14 1994ORDER: Motion of the River Master for approval of fees and expenses is GRANTED and the River Master is awarded $972.00 for the period July 1- September 30, 1994, to be paid equally by the parties.
Feb 06 1995Statement of River Master re: fees and expenses for October 1- December 31, 1994 received.
Apr 20 1995Motion of River Master for award of fees and reimbursement of expenses filed.
May 01 1995ORDER: Motion of the River Master for approval of fees and expenses is GRANTED and the River Master is awarded $2,808.0 for the period January 1- March 31, 1995, to be paid equally by the parties.
Jun 28 1995Pecos River Master's Final Report for Accounting Year 1995 received.
Oct 02 1995ORDER: Motion of the River Master for approval of fees and expenses is GRANTED and the River Master is awarded $3,999.78 for the period April 1- June 30, 1995, to be paid equally by the parties.
Feb 15 1996Statement from River Master re: fees and expenses for period October 1-December 31, 1995, filed. (nothing due from parties).
May 22 1996Motion of River Master for award of fees and reimbursement of expenses filed.
May 22 1996Motion of River Master for reimbursement of fees and expenses filed.
Jun 03 1996ORDER: Motion of the River Master for approval of fees and expenses is GRANTED and the River Master is awarded $2,632.00 for the period January 1- March 31, 1996, to be paid equally by the parties.
Jun 24 1996Pecos River Master's Final Report for Accounting Year 1996 filed.
Oct 07 1996ORDER: Motion of the River Master for approval of fees and expenses is GRANTED and the River Master is awarded $4,752.67 for the period April 1- June 30 1996, to be paid equally by the parties.
Nov 01 1996Motion of the River Master for fees and reimbursement of expenses filed.
Nov 12 1996ORDER: Motion of the River Master for approval of fees and expenses is GRANTED and the River Master is awarded $1218.00 for the period July 1-September 30, 1996, to be paid equally by the parties.
Apr 29 1997Motion of River Master for fees and expenses filed.
May 19 1997ORDER: Motion of the River Master for approval of fees and expenses is GRANTED and the River Master is awarded $2,758.00 for the period January 1- March 31, 1997, to be paid equally by the parties.
Jun 30 1997Pecos River Master's Final Report for Accounting Year 1997 filed.
Sep 10 1997Motion of River Master for fees and expenses filed.
Oct 14 1997ORDER: Motion of the River Master for approval of fees and expenses is GRANTED and the River Master is awarded $4,071.59 for the period April 1- June 30, 1997, to be paid equally by the parties.
Nov 20 1997Statement for fees and expenses for July 1- Septemeber 30, 1997, filed.
Jun 15 1998ORDER: Motion of the River Master for approval of fees and expenses is GRANTED and the River Master is awarded $2,445.00 for the period January 1- March 31, 1998, to be paid equally by the parties.
Jun 25 1998Pecos River Master's Final Report for Accounting Year 1998 filed
Aug 24 1998Motion of River Master for fees and expenses filed.
Apr 15 1999Motion of River Master for fees and expenses filed.
Apr 26 1999ORDER: Motion of the River Master for approval of fees and expenses is GRANTED and the River Master is awarded $2,505.00 for the period January 1- March 31, 1998, to be paid equally by the parties.
Jun 21 1999Pecos River Master's Final Report for Accounting Year 1999 filed.
Oct 12 1999ORDER: Motion of the River Master for approval of fees and expenses is GRANTED and the River Master is awarded $3,189.89 for the period April 1- June 30, 1999, to be paid equally by the parties.
May 04 2000Motion of River Master for fees and expenses filed.
Jun 05 2000ORDER: Motion of the River Master for approval of fees and expenses is GRANTED and the River Master is awarded $2,439.00 for the period January 1- March 31, 2000, to be paid equally by the parties.
Jun 28 2000Pecos River Master's Final Report for Accounting Year 2000 filed.
Aug 28 2000Motion of River Master for fees and expenses filed.
Oct 10 2000ORDER: Motion of the River Master for approval of fees and expenses is GRANTED and the River Master is awarded $2,885.93 for the period April 1- June 30, 2000, to be paid equally by the parties.
Jul 02 2001Pecos River Master's Final Report for Accounting Year 2001.
Sep 19 2001Motion of River Master for fees and expenses filed.
Oct 15 2001ORDER: Motion of the River Master for approval of fees and expenses is GRANTED and the River Master is awarded $2,970.18 for the period April 1- June 30, 2001, to be paid equally by the parties.
Jun 06 2002Agreed Request to Modify Section B.1.c(1) of the River Master's Manual approved by River Master effective June 6, 2002, filed.
Aug 15 2002Motion of River Master for fees and expenses filed.
Aug 21 2002Motion Distributed. September 30, 2002 (page 121)
Oct 07 2002ORDER: Motion of the River Master for fees and reimbursement of expenses is granted, and the River Master is awarded a total of $5,820.53 for the period January 1, 2002, through June 30, 2002 to be paid equally by the parties.
May 13 2003Motion of River Master for fees and expenses for the period January 1, 2003 through March 31, 2003 filed.
May 27 2003Motion Distributed. June 12, 2003 (page 4)
Jun 16 2003Motion of River Master for fees and expenses for the period January 1, 2003 through March 31, 2003 GRANTED.
Jun 26 2003Pecos River Master's Final Report for Accounting Year 2003.
Aug 06 2003Revised River Master's Manual dated July 28, 2003 received.
Sep 16 2003Motion of River Master for fees and expenses for the period April 1, 2003 through July 31, 2003 filed by River Master.
Oct 01 2003Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 17, 2003.
Oct 20 2003Motion for fees and expenses for the period April 1, 2003 through July 31, 2003 GRANTED.
Jun 16 2004Motion for fees and expenses for the period January 1, 2004 through March 31, 2004 filed by River Master.
Jun 21 2004Pecos River Master's Final Report for Accounting Year 2004.
Jun 30 2004Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 27, 2004.
Jul 12 2004Motion for fees and expenses for the period April 1, 2004 through June 30, 2004 filed by River Master.
Jul 14 2004Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 27, 2004.
Oct 04 2004Motion for fees and expenses for the period January 1, 2005 through March 31, 2005 filed by River Master.
Oct 04 2004Motion for fees and expenses for the period April 1, 2004 through June 30, 2004 filed by River Master. GRANTED.
May 10 2005Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 26, 2005.
May 31 2005Motion for fees and expenses for the period January 1, 2005 through March 31, 2005 filed by River Master. GRANTED.
Jul 07 2005Pecos River Master's Final Report for Accounting Year 2005.
Jul 14 2005Motion for fees and expenses for the period April 1, 2005 through June 30, 2005 filed by River Master filed by River Master.
Jul 27 2005Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2005.
Oct 03 2005The motion of the River Master for fees and reimbursement of expenses is granted, and the River Master is awarded a total of $4750.22 for the period April 1, 2005, through June 30, 2005, to be paid equally by the parties. The Chief Justice took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
Jul 05 2006Pecos River Master's Final Report for Accounting Year 2006.
Jul 25 2006Motion for fees and expenses for the period July 1, 2005 through June 30, 2006 filed by River Master.
Aug 16 2006Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2006.
Oct 02 2006The Motion of the River Master for fees and reimbursement of expenses is GRANTED and the River Master is awarded a total of $6,262.49 for the period July 1, 2005 through June 30, 2006 to be paid equally by the parties.
Jul 08 2007Pecos River Master's Final Report for Accounting Year 2007.
Aug 10 2007Motion for fees and expenses for the period July 1, 2006 through June 30, 2007 filed by River Master.
Aug 22 2007Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 24, 2007.
Oct 01 2007The Motion of the River Master for fees and reimbursement of expenses is GRANTED and the River Master is awarded a total of $5,995.61 for the period July 1, 2006 through June 30, 2007 to be paid equally by the parties.
Jul 03 2008Pecos River Master's Final Report for Accounting Year 2008.
Jul 22 2008Motion for fees and expenses for the period July 1, 2007 through June 30, 2008 filed by the River Master.
Oct 06 2008The Motion of the River Master for fees and reimbursement of expenses is GRANTED and the River Master is awarded a total of $6,673.16 for the period July 1, 2007 through June 30, 2008 to be paid equally by the parties.
Jul 06 2009Pecos River Master's Final Report for Accounting Year 2009.
Jul 28 2009Motion for fees and expenses for the period July 1, 2008 through June 30, 2009 filed by River M (CL Page 162)
Aug 12 2009Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 29, 2009.
Oct 05 2009The Motion of the River Master for fees and reimbursement of expenses is Granted, and the River Master is awarded a total of $6,910.61 for the period July 1, 2008, through June 30, 2009, to be paid equally by the parties.
Jul 07 2010Pecos River Master's Final Report for Accounting Year 2010.
Jul 13 2010Motion for fees and expenses for the period July 1, 2009 through June 30, 2010 filed by River Master. (CL Page 162)
Jul 28 2010Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 27, 2010.
Oct 04 2010The motion of the River Master for fees and reimbursement of expenses is granted, and the River Master is awarded a total of $7,083.87 for the period July 1, 2009 through June 30, 2010, to be paid equally by the parties.
Jun 28 2011Pecos River Master's Final Report for Accounting Year 2011.
Jul 25 2011Motion fees and expenses for the period July 1, 2010 through June 30, 2011 filed by River Master.
Aug 10 2011Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2011.
Oct 03 2011The motion of the River Master for fees and reimbursement of expenses is granted, and the River Master is awarded a total of $6,885.82 for the period July 1, 2010, through June 30, 2011, to be paid equally by the parties.
Jul 11 2012Pecos River Master's Final Report for Accounting Year 2012.
Jul 16 2012Motion for fees and expenses for the period July 1, 2011 through June 30, 2012 filed by River Master.
Jul 18 2012Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 24, 2012.
Oct 01 2012The motion of the River Master for fees and reimbursement of expenses is granted, and the River Master is awarded a total of $6,88.59 for the period July 1, 2011, through June 30, 2012, to be paid equally by the parties.
Jul 02 2013Pecos River Master's Final Report for Accounting Year 2013.
Aug 06 2013Motion for fees and expenses for the period July 1, 2012 through June 30, 2013 filed by River Master.
Aug 21 2013Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 30, 2013.
Oct 07 2013The motion of the River Master for fees and reimbursement of expenses is granted, and the River Master is awarded a total of $6889.03 for the period July 1, 2012 through June 30, 2013, to be paid equally by the parties.
Jul 17 2014Motion for fees and expenses for the period July 1, 2013 through June 30, 2014 filed by River Master.
Jul 17 2014Pecos River Master's Final Report for Accounting Year 2014.
Jul 25 2014Joint Motion Requesting Review of the River Master's Final Determination filed by the parties.
Aug 13 2014Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 29, 2014.
Aug 25 2014Letter withdrawing the Joint Motion Requesting Review of the River Master's Final Determination filed by the parties.
Oct 06 2014Motion for fees and expenses GRANTED and the River Master is awarded a total of $8455.87 for the period July 1, 2013, through June 30, 2014, to be paid equally by the parties.
Jul 07 2015Pecos River Master's Final Report for Accounting Year 2015.
Aug 10 2015Motion for fees and expenses for the period July 1, 2014, through June 30, 2015 filed by River Master.
Aug 26 2015Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 28, 2015.
Oct 05 2015Motion for fees and expenses GRANTED and the River Master is awarded a total of $10,327.05 for the period July 1, 2014 through June 30, 2015, to be paid equally by the parties.
Jun 28 2016Pecos River Master's Final Report for Accounting Year 2016.
Jul 14 2016Motion for fees and expenses for the period July 1, 2015, through June 30, 2016 filed by River Master.
Jul 27 2016Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016.
Oct 03 2016Motion for fees and expenses GRANTED and the River Master is awarded a total of $12,227.20, for the period July 1, 2015, through June 30, 2016, to be paid equally by the parties.
Jul 21 2017Pecos River Master's Final Report for Accounting Year 2017.
Aug 08 2017Motion for fees and expenses for the period July 1, 2016 through June 30, 2017 filed by River Master.
Oct 02 2017Motion for fees and expenses GRANTED and the River Master is awarded a total of $7505.97, for the period July 1, 2016, through June 30, 2017, to be paid equally by the parties.
Jun 26 2018Joint motion for an extension of time for the Pecos River Master to file his Final Report for Accounting Year 2018.
Main Document
Jun 28 2018Joint motion for an extension of time granted. The time for the Pecos River Master to file his Final Report for Accounting Year 2018 is extended to and including September 10, 2018.
Sep 06 2018Pecos River Master's Final Report for Accounting Year 2018.
Main Document
Oct 04 2018Motion for an extension of time to file a motion to review Special Master's determination filed by plaintiff State of Texas.
Main Document
Oct 09 2018Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time granted. The time for the State of Texas to file a motion for review of the River Master's September 6, 2018 final determination is extended to and including December 10, 2018.
Oct 10 2018Motion for fees and expenses for the period July 1, 2017 through June 30, 2018 filed by River Master.
Main Document
Oct 17 2018Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 2, 2018..
Nov 05 2018The motion of the River Master for fees and expenses is granted, and the River Master is awarded a total of $14,242.82, for the period July 1, 2017, through June 30, 2018, to be paid equally by the parties.
Nov 20 2018Motion for a further extension of time to file a motion to review Special Master's determination filed by plaintiff State of Texas.
Main Document
Nov 28 2018Plaintiff's motion for an additional extension of time granted. The time for the State of Texas to file a motion for review of the River Master's September 6, 2018 final determination is extended to and including December 17, 2018.
Dec 17 2018Motion for review of River Master's Final Determination filed by plaintiff State of Texas.
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceOther
Jan 02 2019Motion for an extension of time to file response to plaintiff's motion for review of Special Master's determination filed by defendant State of New Mexico.
Main Document
Jan 02 2019Defendant's motion for an extension of time granted. The time for the State of New Mexico to file a response to plaintiff's motion for review of the River Master's September 6, 2018 final determination is extended to and including February 15, 2019.
Feb 15 2019Response to motion for review of River Master's Final Determination from respondent State of New Mexico filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceOther
Feb 22 2019Motion to extend the time to file reply in support of motion for review to April 26, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 27 2019Motion to extend the time to file reply is granted and the time is extended to and including April 26, 2019.
Apr 26 2019Reply of petitioner State of Texas filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2019The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States with respect to the motion for review of the River Master's final determination.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Plaintiff
Thomas BohlAssistant Attorney General
3000 W. 15th Street, 10th Floor
Austin, TX 78701

(512) 463-2012
Party name: State of Texas, Plaintiff
Jane Elizabeth Atwood
    Counsel of Record
Assistant Attorney General
Environmental Protection Division
PO Box 12548
Austin, TX 78711

(512)-475-4006
Party name: State of Texas, Plaintiff
Kyle Douglas Hawkins
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548
Austin, TX 78711-2548

kyle.hawkins@oag.texas.gov
5129361700
Party name: State of Texas
Attorneys for Respondent
Amy I. Haas
    Counsel of Record
General Counsel
New Mexico Interstate Stream Commission
PO Box 25102
Santa Fe, NM 87504

(505) 476-0553
Party name: State of New Mexico
Other
Neil S. GriggProfessional Engineer
905 Edwards Street
Fort Collins, CO 80524

(970) 491-3369
Party name: River Master

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543