Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-982 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-982 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Ryan Thornell, Director, Arizona Department of Corrections, Petitioner
v.
Danny Lee Jones
Docketed:April 10, 2023
Linked with 22A685
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-99005)
   Decision Date:November 7, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 26 2023Application (22A685) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 5, 2023 to April 6, 2023, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentOtherOtherProof of Service
Jan 31 2023Application (22A685) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until April 6, 2023.
Apr 06 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 10, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 01 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 10, 2023 to July 9, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 02 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 10, 2023. See Rule 30.1.
Jul 03 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 10, 2023 to August 9, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 05 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 9, 2023.
Aug 07 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 9, 2023 to August 23, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 08 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 23, 2023.
Aug 23 2023Brief of respondent Danny Lee Jones in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 23 2023Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Danny Lee Jones.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 31 2023Reply of petitioner Ryan Thornell, Director, Arizona Department of Corrections filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023.
Oct 02 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2023.
Oct 10 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2023.
Oct 23 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2023.
Oct 30 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/3/2023.
Oct 31 2023Record Requested.
Nov 06 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2023.
Nov 13 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/17/2023.
Nov 27 2023Record received from the U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona (Phoenix Division) (3 boxes).
Nov 27 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2023.
Dec 01 2023Rescheduled.
Dec 01 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Laura Patrice Chiasson
    Counsel of Record
Arizona Attorney General
400 W. Congress, Suite S-215
Tucson, AZ 85701

LAURA.CHIASSON@AZAG.GOV
5206286520
Party name: Ryan Thornell, Director, Arizona Department of Corrections
Jeffrey Lee SparksArizona Attorney General
2005 N. Central Avenue
Phoenix, AZ 85004

JEFFREY.SPARKS@AZAG.GOV
6025424686
Party name: Ryan Thornell
Attorneys for Respondent
Jean-Claude Andre
    Counsel of Record
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner
120 Broadway, Suite 300
Santa Monica, CA 90401-2386

JCANDRE@BCLPLAW.COM
3105762148
Party name: Danny Lee Jones

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543