Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-859
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-859
Title:Securities and Exchange Commission, Petitioner
v.
George R. Jarkesy, Jr., et al.
Docketed:March 9, 2023
Linked with 22A596, 23A55
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-61007)
   Decision Date:May 18, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:October 21, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 05 2023Application (22A596) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 19, 2023 to February 17, 2023, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 06 2023Application (22A596) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until February 17, 2023.
Jan 26 2023Application (22A596) to extend further the time from February 17, 2023 to March 20, 2023, submitted to Justice Alito.
Written RequestProof of Service
Jan 30 2023Application (22A596) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 20, 2023.
Mar 08 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 10, 2023)
PetitionProof of Service
Mar 27 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 10, 2023 to May 10, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 28 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 10, 2023.
Apr 28 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 10, 2023 to June 9, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 04 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part, and the time is extended to and including May 23, 2023, for all respondents.
May 23 2023Brief of respondents George R. Jarkesy, Jr., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain Document
Jun 06 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/22/2023.
Jun 06 2023Reply of petitioner Securites and Exchange Commission filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Jun 29 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/29/2023.
Jun 30 2023Petition GRANTED.
Jul 17 2023Motion for an extension of time within which to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 17 2023Application (23A55) for leave to file briefs on the merits in excess of the word limits, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 18 2023Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Securites and Exchange Commission.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 19 2023Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 28, 2023. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including October 11, 2023.
Jul 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of Andrew N. Vollmer in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 26 2023Application for leave to file briefs on the merits in excess of the word limits (23A55) granted by Justice Alito provided that the opening and response briefs do not exceed 18,000 words each, and that the reply brief does not exceed 8,000 words.
Aug 21 2023Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Aug 22 2023Brief amicus curiae of Professor Ilan Wurman in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 22 2023Brief amicus curiae of Anthony Michael Sabino filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 28 2023Brief of petitioner Securites and Exchange Commission filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Aug 28 2023Brief amicus curiae of Forum of United States Administrative Law Judges in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 01 2023Amicus brief of Administrative Law Scholars not accepted for filing. (September 06, 2023)
Sep 01 2023Brief amici curiae of Administrative Law Scholars (Sept. 12, 2023) filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 01 2023Brief amicus curiae of Federal Administrative Law Judges Conference filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 05 2023Brief amici curiae of Professors John M. Golden and Thomas H. Lee filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2023Brief amicus curiae of National Treasury Employees Union filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2023Brief amicus curiae of The North American Securities Administrators Association, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2023Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2023Brief amicus curiae of Association of Administrative Law Judges filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2023Brief amicus curiae of Jed H. Shugerman filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2023Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 26 2023Motion of Administrative Law Scholars for leave to participate in oral argument as amici curiae and for divided argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 04 2023Amicus brief of Morris & Dickson not accepted for filing. (Corrected version submitted--October 06, 2023.)
Oct 04 2023Brief amicus curiae of Morris & Dickson (Oct. 10, 2023) filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 11 2023Brief of respondents George R. Jarkesy, Jr., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 12 2023SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, November 29, 2023.
Oct 13 2023Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit.
Oct 16 2023Brief amicus curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 17 2023Brief amicus curiae of Competitive Enterprise Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 17 2023Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2023Brief amici curiae of American Bankers Association, American Association of Bank Directors, and Bank Policy Institute filed. ( Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of Claremont Institute's Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of Independent Women's Law Center filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of TotalEnergies Gas & Power North America, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2023Brief amici curiae of The Institute for Justice, Sun Valley Orchards, LLC, Procraft Masonry, LLC, and C.S. Lawn & Landscape, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of Pioneer Public Interest Law Center filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of Energy Transfer LP filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of New Civil Liberties Alliance filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2023Brief amici curiae of State of West Virginia and 17 Other States filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2023Brief amici curiae of Phillip Goldstein, Nelson Obus, Mark Cuban, Elon Musk, Manouch Moshayedi, and Investor Choice Advocates Network filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of America First Policy Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Justice Center filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of David Julian filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2023Brief amici curiae of CTIA-The Wireless Association, USTelecom-The Broadband Association, and Competitive Carriers Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2023Brief amici curiae of Constitutional Originalists Edwin Meese III, Steven G. Calabresi, and Garry S. Lawson filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2023Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States, the National Federation of Independent Small Business Legal Center, Inc., and Business Roundtable filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2023Brief amici curiae of Advancing American Freedom, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 19 2023CIRCULATED
Oct 25 2023Electronic record received from the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit.
Oct 30 2023Motion of Administrative Law Scholars for leave to participate in oral argument as amici curiae and for divided argument DENIED.
Nov 13 2023Reply of petitioner Securites and Exchange Commission filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 29 2023Argued. For petitioner: Brian H. Fletcher, Principal Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondents: S. Michael McColloch, Dallas, Tex.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Securites and Exchange Commission
Attorneys for Respondents
Sidney Michael McColloch
    Counsel of Record
S. Michael McColloch, PLLC
6060 N. Central Expressway
Suite 500
Dallas, TX 75206

SMM@MCCOLLOCH-LAW.COM
2146741868
Party name: George R. Jarkesy, Jr., et al.
Karen Lundskow CookKaren Cook, PLLC
6060 N. Central Expressway
Suite 500
Dallas, TX 75206

KAREN@KARENCOOKLAW.COM
2147299098
Party name: George R. Jarkesy, Jr., et al.
Other
Manuel G. Berrelez
    Counsel of Record
Vinson and Elkins LLP
2001 Ross Ave.
Suite 3900
Dallas, TX 75201

MBERRELEZ@VELAW.COM
214-220-7709
Party name: American Bankers Association, American Association of Bank Directors, and Bank Policy Institute
Anastasia Paulinna Boden
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

aboden@cato.org
202-216-1414
Party name: Cato Institute
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Counsel Group
1628 N Main St. #289
Salinas, CA 93906

ATCASO@CCG1776.COM
916-601-1916
Party name: Claremont Institute's Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Ronald William Chapman II
    Counsel of Record
Chapman Law Group
1441 W. Long Lake Road, Suite 310
Troy, MI 48098

rwchapman@chapmanlawgroup.com
(248) 644-6326
Party name: Federal Administrative Law Judges Conference
Jeffrey Benjamin Dubner
    Counsel of Record
Democracy Forward Foundation
P.O. Box 34553
Washington, DC 20043

Jdubner@democracyforward.org
(202) 448-9090
Party name: Jed H. Shugerman
Lawrence S. Ebner
    Counsel of Record
Atlantic Legal Foundation
1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

lawrence.ebner@atlanticlegal.org
202-729-6337
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation
Steven Andrew Engel
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
1900 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

STEVEN.ENGEL@DECHERT.COM
(202) 261-3369
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States, the National Federation of Independent Small Business Legal Center, Inc., and Business Roundtable
Deborah Delores Enix-Ross
    Counsel of Record
American Bar Association
321 N. Clark St.
Chicago , IL 60654

AMICUSBRIEFS@AMERICANBAR.ORG
312-988-5000
Party name: American Bar Association
Steven Anson Glazer
    Counsel of Record
FORUM of United States Administrative Law Judges
P.O. Box 14076
Washington, DC 20044

forumalj@gmail.com
(301) 332-9214
Party name: FORUM of United States Administrative Law Judges
Hyland Hunt
    Counsel of Record
Deutsch Hunt, PLLC
300 New Jersey Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

HHUNT@DEUTSCHHUNT.COM
2028686915
Party name: Association of Administrative Law Judges
Robert Everett Johnson
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
16781 Chagrin Blvd. #256
Shaker Heights, OH 44120

rejohnson83@gmail.com
(703) 682-9320
Party name: The Institute for Justice, Sun Valley Orchards, LLC, Procraft Masonry, LLC, and C.S. Lawn & Landscape, Inc.
Thomas Michael Johnson Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein LLP
2050 M Street NW
Washington, DC 20036

TMJOHNSON@WILEY.LAW
2027194550
Party name: CTIA-The Wireless Association, USTelecom-The Broadband Association, and Competitive Carriers Association
Richard Polk Lawson
    Counsel of Record
Gardner Brewer Hudson
400 N. Ashley Dr.
Suite 1100
Tampa, FL 33602

RLAWSON@GARDNERBREWER.COM
813-952-8882
Party name: America First Policy Institute
Thomas H. Lee
    Counsel of Record
Hughes, Hubbard & Reed
One Battery Park Plaza
New York, NY 10004

thomas.lee@hugheshubbard.com
3473246000
Party name: Professors John M. Golden and Thomas H. Lee
Margaret Ann Little
    Counsel of Record
New Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th St. NW, Suite 450
Washington, DC 20036-0000

PEGGY.LITTLE@NCLA.ONMICROSOFT.COM
2028695212
Party name: New Civil Liberties Alliance
Matthew Theodore Martens
    Counsel of Record
WilmerHale
2100 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20037

MATTHEW.MARTENS@WILMERHALE.COM
202-663-6000
Party name: David Julian
Vincente Leon Martinez
    Counsel of Record
North American Securities Administrators Assoc.
750 First Street, NE, Suite 990
Washington, DC 20002

vmartinez@nasaa.org
202-3680419
Party name: The North American Securities Administrators Association, Inc.
Jeremy Charles Marwell
    Counsel of Record
Vinson & Elkins LLP
2200 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 500W
Washington, DC 20037

JMARWELL@VELAW.COM
202-639-6507
Party name: TotalEnergies Gas & Power North America, Inc.
John Mercer Masslon II
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20036

JMASSLON@WLF.ORG
(202) 588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Hashim M. Mooppan
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

HMMOOPPAN@JONESDAY.COM
2028793744
Party name: Morris & Dickson
Nicolas Morgan
    Counsel of Record
Paul Hastings LLP
515 South Flower Street, 25th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

nicolasmorgan@paulhastings.com
(213) 683-6181
Party name: Phillip Goldstein, Nelson Obus, Mark Cuban, Elon Musk, Manouch Moshayedi, and Investor Choice Advocates Network
Alan B. Morrison
    Counsel of Record
George Washington Law School
2000 H Street NW
Washington, DC 20052

ABMORRISON@LAW.GWU.EDU
2029947120
Party name: Administrative Law Scholars
Ashley C. Parrish
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding LLP
1700 Pennsylvania Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20006

APARRISH@KSLAW.COM
(202) 737-0500
Party name: Pioneer Public Interest Law Center
Michael David Pepson
    Counsel of Record
Americans for Prosperity Foundation
1310 N. Courthouse Rd., Ste. 700
Arlington, VA 22201

mpepson@afphq.org
5713294529
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation
Anthony Michael Sabino
    Counsel of Record
Sabino & Sabino, P.C.
92 Willis Avenue, 2nd Floor
Mineola, NY 11501

ANTHONY.SABINO@SABINOLAW.COM
516-294-3199
Party name: Anthony Michael Sabino
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

GSCHAERR@SCHAERR-JAFFE.COM
202-787-1060
Party name: Independent Women's Law Center
William S. Scherman
    Counsel of Record
Vinson & Elkins
2200 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20037

wscherman@velaw.com
202-256-7000
Party name: Energy Transfer LP
Lindsay Sara See
    Counsel of Record
Office of the West Virginia Attorney General
State Capitol Complex
Building 1, Room E-26
Charleston, WV 25305

LINDSAY.S.SEE@WVAGO.GOV
3045582021
Party name: State of West Virginia and 17 Other States
Loren Ariela Seehase
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
440 N. Wells Street
Suite 200
Chicago, IL 60654

lseehase@libertyjusticecenter.org
312-637-2280
Party name: Liberty Justice Center
Kathryn Elizabeth TarbertSchaerr Jaffe LLP
1717 K Street NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

ktarbert@schaerr-jaffe.com
2027871060
Party name: Independent Women's Law Center
Andrew N. Vollmer
    Counsel of Record
Mercatus Center at George Mason University
3434 Washington Boulevard
Arlington, VA 22201

andrew.vollmer@gmail.com
703-993-8840
Party name: Andrew N. Vollmer
Amit Ramnik Vora
    Counsel of Record
Kasowitz Benson Torres LLP
1633 Broadway
New York, NY 10019

avora@kasowitz.com
2038878158
Party name: Constitutional Originalists Edwin Meese III, Steven G. Calabresi, and Garry S. Lawson
Charles Devin Watkins
    Counsel of Record
Competitive Enterprise Institute
1310 L Street NW, 7th Floor
Washington, DC 20005

devin.watkins@cei.org
503-753-8104
Party name: Competitive Enterprise Institute
John Marc Wheat
    Counsel of Record
Advancing American Freedom, Inc.
801 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Suite 930
Washington, DC 20004-2729

MWHEAT@ADVANCINGAMERICANFREEDOM.COM
(202) 780-4848
Party name: Advancing American Freedom, Inc.
Julie Marie Wilson
    Counsel of Record
800 K Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20001

JULIE.WILSON@NTEU.ORG
703-352-3325
Party name: National Treasury Employees Union
Ilan Wurman
    Counsel of Record
Sandra Day O'Connor College of Law
111 E. Taylor St , MC 9520
Phoenix, AZ 85004

ilan.wurman@asu.edu
480-965-2245
Party name: Professor Ilan Wurman
Allison M. Zieve
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street NW
Washington, DC 20009

AZIEVE@CITIZEN.ORG
202-588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543