Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-842
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-842
Title:National Rifle Association of America, Petitioner
v.
Maria T. Vullo
Docketed:March 6, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-636-cv)
   Decision Date:September 22, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:November 9, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 07 2023Motion (22M73) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari with the supplemental appendix under seal filed.
Feb 07 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 5, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 15 2023MOTION (22M73) DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/3/2023.
Mar 06 2023Motion (22M73) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari with the supplemental appendix under seal Granted.
Mar 21 2023Brief amici curiae of Financial & Business Law Scholars filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 05 2023Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 05 2023Brief amici curiae of Montana, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 19 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/11/2023.
Apr 24 2023Response Requested. (Due May 24, 2023)
Apr 26 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 24, 2023 to June 23, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 01 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 23, 2023.
May 23 2023Brief amicus curiae of Competitive Enterprise Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 23 2023Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Goldwater Institute.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 24 2023Brief amici curiae of Texas, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 24 2023Brief amicus curiae of Gun Owners of America, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Eugene Volokh
    Counsel of Record
UCLA School of Law
385 Charles E. Young Dr. E
Los Angeles, CA 90095

volokh@law.ucla.edu
310-206-3926
Party name: National Rifle Association of America
Attorneys for Respondent
Andrew G. Celli Jr.Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel LLP
600 Fifth Avenue, 10th Floor
New York, NY 10020

acelli@ecbawm.com
(212) 763-5000
Party name: Maria T. Vullo
Other
John Franklin Bash
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
1300 I St. NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20005

johnbash@quinnemanuel.com
(202) 538-8000
Party name: Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression
R. Trent McCotter
    Counsel of Record
Boyden Gray & Associates PLLC
801 17th Street, N.W.
Suite 350
Washington, DC 20006

MCCOTTER@BOYDENGRAYASSOCIATES.COM
202-706-5488
Party name: Financial & Business Law Scholars
Jeremiah Lee Morgan
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Avenue West
Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180-5615

jmorgan@lawandfreedom.com
7033565070
Party name: Gun Owners of America, Inc., Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of California, Heller Foundation, America's Future, Citizens United, Citizens United Foundation, Public Advocate of the United States, Leadership Institute, Free Speech Coalition, Free Speech Defense and Education Fund, DownsizeDC.org, Downsize DC Foundation, U.S. Constitutional Rights Legal Defense Fund, and Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund
Timothy Mason Sandefur
    Counsel of Record
Goldwater Institute
500 E. Coronado Road
Phoenix, AZ 85004

TSANDEFUR@GOLDWATERINSTITUTE.ORG
6024625000
Party name: Goldwater Institute
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

JUDD.STONE@OAG.TEXAS.GOV
512-936-1700
Party name: The States of Texas and Indiana
Peter Martin Torstensen Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Montana Attorney General's Office
215 North Sanders Street
Helena, MT 59601

PETER.TORSTENSEN@MT.GOV
406-444-2026
Party name: Montana
Charles Devin Watkins
    Counsel of Record
Competitive Enterprise Institute
1310 L Street NW, 7th Floor
Washington, DC 20005

devin.watkins@cei.org
503-753-8104
Party name: Competitive Enterprise Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543