Docket for 22-7574 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
May 03 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 15, 2023) | | Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | May 23 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 15, 2023 to July 17, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | May 24 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 17, 2023. | | | Jun 20 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 17, 2023 to August 16, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Jun 21 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 16, 2023. | | | Jul 12 2023 | Brief of respondent Tim Shoop, Warden in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jul 18 2023 | Reply of petitioner Nawaz Ahmed filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Jul 27 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023. | | | Oct 02 2023 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|