Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 22-7466 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 22-7466 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Richard Eugene Glossip, Petitioner
v.
Oklahoma
Docketed:May 4, 2023
Linked with 22A941
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(PCD-2023-267)
   Decision Date:April 20, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 26 2023Application (22A941) for stay of execution of sentence of death submitted to Justice Kavanaugh. (Justice Gorsuch is recused).
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsOtherProof of Service
May 01 2023Response to application from respondent Oklahoma filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceMain Document
May 04 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 5, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service
May 05 2023Application (22A941) referred to the Court.
May 05 2023Application (22A941) for stay of execution of sentence of death presented to Justice Kavanaugh and by him referred to the Court is granted pending the disposition of the petitions for writs of certiorari, Nos. 22-6500 and 22-7466. Should both petitions for writs of certiorari be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event either petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the issuance of the mandate of this Court. Justice Gorsuch took not part in the consideration or decision of this application.
May 31 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 5, 2023 to July 5, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 01 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 5, 2023.
Jun 05 2023Brief amicus curiae of The Innocence Project filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 05 2023Brief amici curiae of Nora Freeman Engstrom, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 05 2023Brief amici curiae of Derek Van Treese, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 05 2023Brief of respondent Oklahoma in support filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 19 2023Reply of petitioner Richard Glossip filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023.
Oct 02 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2023.
Oct 10 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2023.
Oct 23 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2023.
Oct 30 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/3/2023.
Nov 06 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2023.
Nov 13 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/17/2023.
Nov 27 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2023.
Dec 01 2023Rescheduled.
Dec 01 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Amy Pickering Knight
    Counsel of Record
Phillips Black, Inc.
1721 Broadway, Suite 201
Oakland, CA 94612

AMY@AMYKNIGHTLAW.COM
520-878-8849
Party name: Richard Glossip
Attorneys for Respondent
Gentner F. Drummond
    Counsel of Record
Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

GENTNER.DRUMMOND@OAG.OK.GOV
4055213921
Party name: Oklahoma
Other
Paul G. Cassell
    Counsel of Record
Utah Appellate Project
S.J. Quinney College of Law at the University of Utah
383 S. University St.
Salt Lake City, UT 84112

pgcassell.law@gmail.com
8015855202
Party name: Derek Van Treese, Donna Van Treese, and Alana Mileto, and the Oklahoma District Attorneys Association
Meaghan Elizabeth McLaine VerGow
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 Eye Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

mvergow@omm.com
(202)-383-5300
Party name: Nora Freeman Engstrom, Bruce A. Green, Peter A. Joy, W. Bradley Wendel, Ronald F. Wright, And Ellen C. Yaroshefsky
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
2100 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20037

SETH.WAXMAN@WILMERHALE.COM
202-663-6800
Party name: The Innocence Project

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543